Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2576222 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180026953 EP11730053



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8860388Global Dossier 14.10.2014B2
US2013194833 01.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201009150 01.06.2010
WO2011GB51025 31.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2013534475Global Dossier 05.09.2013A
Priority number Date
GB201009150 01.06.2010
WO2011GB51025 31.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102917880Global Dossier 06.02.2013A
Priority number Date
GB201009150 01.06.2010
WO2011GB51025 31.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2576222Global Dossier 10.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201009150 01.06.2010
WO2011GB51025 31.05.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012030622 16.08.2016A2
Priority number Date
GB201009150 01.06.2010
WO2011GB51025 31.05.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011151642Global Dossier 08.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
GB201009150 01.06.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2480822 17.05.2017B
GB2480822 07.12.2011A
GB201009150D 14.07.2010D0
Priority number Date
GB201009150 01.06.2010