Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2576222

EP2576222 - DRIVER CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Global Inkjet Systems Limited
The Jeffreys Building
Cowley Road
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB4 0DS / GB
[2013/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PENBERTH, Michael
9 The Butts
Soham
Cambridgeshire CB7 5AN / GB
 [2013/15]
Representative(s)Clarke, Geoffrey Howard , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Ave
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]Clarke, Geoffrey Howard , et al
Avidity IP
Kestrel House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2013/15]Turnbull, Alexander James , et al
HLBBshaw Ltd
Merlin House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date11730053.331.05.2011
WO2011GB51025
Priority number, dateGB2010000915001.06.2010         Original published format: GB 201009150
[2013/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011151642
Date:08.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2576222
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011
[2013/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/045, H03K4/94, H01L41/04
[2013/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/15]
TitleGerman:TREIBERSCHALTUNG[2013/15]
English:DRIVER CIRCUIT[2013/15]
French:CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE[2013/15]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2012National basic fee paid 
27.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/15]
13.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/21]
08.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5036263  (YAMADA YASUFUMI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,8 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 20 * * column 10, lines 1-4 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6398331  (ASAKA TOSHIYUKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 21 * * column 5, lines 30-52 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]US5543679  (MORINO SEIJI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 22 * * column 9, line 49 - column 11, line 52 * * figures 1,10 *