EP2577618 - PROTECTION MODULE FOR MONITORING THE POSITION OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CargoGuard GmbH Frankfurter Ring 247 80807 München / DE | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAUFUSS, Jean Akilindastrasse 45 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/15] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11730557.3 | 03.06.2011 | WO2011EP02740 | Priority number, date | DE20101029671 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010029671 | [2013/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011151077 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2577618 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G08G1/127, G06Q10/00 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0833 (EP,US);
G08B21/18 (US);
G07C9/38 (EP,US);
G08B21/00 (US);
G08G1/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | SICHERUNGSMODUL ZUR POSITIONSÜBERWACHUNG VON OBJEKTEN | [2013/15] | English: | PROTECTION MODULE FOR MONITORING THE POSITION OF OBJECTS | [2013/15] | French: | MODULE DE SÉCURITÉ POUR SURVEILLER LA POSITION D'OBJETS | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 29.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008061963 (SCHNITZ BENJAMIN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] *; | [XI]US2008297346 (BRACKMANN ROGERS F [US], et al) [X] 1,7,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0111] * [I] 2-6,8-14; | [IY]WO2009111734 (SAVI TECHN INC [US], et al) [I] 1,7,15 * abstract * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 10 * * page 11, line 24 - page 15, line 12 * [Y] 2-6,8-14; | [IY]DE102008033731 (CARGOGUARD GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,7,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0089] * [Y] 2-6,8-14 | Examination | DE19816435 | DE10141539 | DE102005003150 | US2007182544 | by applicant | DE102008033731 |