Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2588079

EP2588079 - CORE-SHEATH IMPLANT DEVICE HAVING AN INNER CORE LOBE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.07.2015
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evonik Corporation
299 Jefferson Road
Parsippany NJ 07054 / US
[2013/21]
Former [2013/19]For all designated states
Evonik Degussa Corporation
299 Jefferson Road
Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUDSON, Michael, E.
59 Hayden Springs Road
Hayden AL 35079 / US
 [2013/19]
Representative(s)Gottschalk, Michael
Evonik Röhm GmbH
DG-IPM-PAT
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau / DE
[2014/38]
Former [2013/19]Gottschalk, Michael
Evonik Röhm GmbH DG-IPM-PAT Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau / DE
Application number, filing date11731215.729.06.2011
WO2011US42314
Priority number, dateUS20100360140P30.06.2010         Original published format: US 360140 P
[2013/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012012162
Date:26.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2588079
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012
[2013/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2588079
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/54, A61L27/34, A61L29/08, A61L29/16, A61L31/10, A61L31/16, A61K9/00
[2014/30]
Former International [2013/19]A61K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KERN-HÜLLE-IMPLANTAT MIT INNEREM KERNLAPPEN[2013/19]
English:CORE-SHEATH IMPLANT DEVICE HAVING AN INNER CORE LOBE[2013/19]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMPLANT NOYAU-GAINE AYANT UN LOBE DE NOYAU INTÉRIEUR[2013/19]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2013National basic fee paid 
22.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/19]
12.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2014Fee for grant paid
29.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2014
Opposition(s)18.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.06.2011
AL17.09.2014
AT17.09.2014
BE17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU29.06.2011
AT17.09.2014
BE17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2017/46]HU29.06.2011
AT17.09.2014
BE17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2017/38]HU29.06.2011
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2017/03]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2016/09]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT17.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]US2006003006  (REMON JEAN P [BE] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0066] , [0 67] , [0 71] *;
 [AP]WO2010111627  (PSIVIDA US INC) [AP] 1-10 * page 3, lines 19-22 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 8 * * page 19, lines 11-22 * * figure 5 *
by applicantUS2006029637