Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2523404

EP2523404 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2012/46]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKASHIMA Masanori
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
02 / HIDAKA Youichi
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
03 / IZAWA Tetsu
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
 [2012/46]
Representative(s)Reeve, Nicholas Edward
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/46]Reeve, Nicholas Edward
Reddie & Grose LLP
Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date11731784.204.01.2011
WO2011JP50019
Priority number, dateJP2010000129206.01.2010         Original published format: JP 2010001292
[2012/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011083786
Date:14.07.2011
Language:JA
[2011/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2523404
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.07.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/705
[2016/39]
Former International [2012/46]H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/46]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERSYSTEM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERVERFAHREN[2012/46]
English:COMMUNICATION CONTROL SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD[2012/46]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION[2012/46]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2012Translation filed 
06.07.2012National basic fee paid 
06.07.2012Search fee paid 
06.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/46]
23.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]  - JAD NAOUS ET AL, "Implementing an OpenFlow switch on the NetFPGA platform", ARCHITECTURES FOR NETWORKING AND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS; 20081106 - 20081107, (2008), doi:10.1145/1477942.1477944, ISBN 978-1-60558-346-4, pages 1 - 9, XP058027283 [A] 1-12 * Chapters 2-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1477942.1477944
 [A]  - Georgia Kontesidou ET AL, "Openflow Virtual Networking: A Flow- Based Network Virtualization Architecture", (20091101), URL: http://www.diva-portal.org/smash/get/diva2:302700/FULLTEXT01.pdf, (20131205), XP055091778 [A] 1-12 * Chapters 4 & 5 *
International search[X]JP2002176433  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.);
 [A]JP2006135970  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.);
 [A]JP2007184969  (FUJITSU LTD.);
 [A]WO2008126179  (FUJITSU LTD.)