Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2521976

EP2521976 - REAL TIME VERIFICATION OF WEB APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.03.2019 [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sauce Labs, Inc.
500 Third Street, Suite 240
San Francisco, California 94107 / US
[2012/46]
Inventor(s)01 / HUGGINS, Jason
725 South Harvey Ave
Oak Park, Illinois 60304 / US
02 / HAZEL, Steven
2125 Hayes St. 5
San Francisco, California 94117 / US
03 / DUNHAM, John
55 Sheridan Street
San Francisco, California 94103 / US
 [2017/48]
Former [2012/46]01 / HUGGINS, Jason
725 South Harvey Ave
Oak Park Illinois 60304 / US
02 / HAZEL, Steven
2125 Hayes St. 5
San Francisco California 94117 / US
03 / DUNHAM, John
55 Sheridan Street
San Francisco California 94103 / US
Representative(s)Heinze, Ekkehard , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[2018/16]
Former [2012/46]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date11732290.910.01.2011
[2018/16]
WO2011US20719
Priority number, dateUS20100293606P08.01.2010         Original published format: US 293606 P
[2012/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011085335
Date:14.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2521976
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011
[2012/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2521976
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.10.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F9/50, G06F21/53, G06F21/56
[2017/47]
Former International [2015/20]G06F15/16, H04L9/32
Former International [2012/46]G06F15/16, G06F21/22, H04L9/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ECHTZEITÜBERPRÜFUNG VON WEBANWENDUNGEN[2012/46]
English:REAL TIME VERIFICATION OF WEB APPLICATIONS[2012/46]
French:VÉRIFICATION EN TEMPS RÉEL D'APPLICATIONS INTERNET[2012/46]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2012National basic fee paid 
30.07.2012Search fee paid 
30.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/46]
30.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2018Fee for grant paid
07.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.10.2017
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201707   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2017
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL18.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009193074  (LEE SANGGYU [KR]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7596620  (COLTON PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - HIMANSHU RAJ ET AL, "Resource management for isolation enhanced cloud services", CCSW '09: PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2009 ACM WORKSHOP ON CLOUD COMPUTING SECURITY, ACM, US, (20091109), ISBN 978-1-60558-784-4, pages 77 - 84, XP008165905 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1655008.1655019
 [A]  - ASIT DAN ET AL, "Connecting Client Objectives with Resource Capabilities: An Essential Component for Grid Service Management Infrastructures", (20041115), pages 57 - 64, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SERVICE ORIENTED COMPUTING, XX, XX, URL: http://portal.acm.org/citation.cfm?doid=1035167.1035177, (20100426), XP002579760 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2009193074  (LEE SANGGYU [KR]);
 [A]US7596620  (COLTON PAUL [US], et al)
 [A]  - RAJ, H. ET AL., "Resource management for isolation enhanced cloud services", THE 2009 ACM WORKSHOP ON CLOUD COMPUTING SECURITY, (2009), pages 77 - 84, XP008165905

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1655008.1655019
 [A]  - DAN, A. ET AL., "Connecting client objectives with resource capabilities: An e ssential component for grid service management infrastructures", THE 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SERVICE ORIENTED COMPUTING, (2004), pages 57 - 64, XP002579760