Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2590582

EP2590582 - SPINAL STABILIZATION SYSTEM UTILIZING SCREW AND EXTERNAL FACET AND/OR LAMINA FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
X-spine Systems, Inc.
452 Alexandersville Road
Miamisburg, OH 45342 / US
[2013/20]
Inventor(s)01 / KIRSCHMAN, David, Louis
5101 Garden Springs Court
Dayton OH 45429 / US
 [2013/20]
Representative(s)Rüfenacht, Philipp Michael , et al
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG
Eigerstrasse 2
Postfach
3000 Bern 14 / CH
[2015/46]
Former [2013/20]Rüfenacht, Philipp Michael , et al
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach
3000 Bern 7 / CH
Application number, filing date11732538.130.06.2011
[2015/46]
WO2011US42636
Priority number, dateUS20100362334P08.07.2010         Original published format: US 362334 P
US20111317366030.06.2011         Original published format: US201113173660
[2013/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012006216
Date:12.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2590582
Date:15.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012
[2013/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2590582
Date:11.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2013/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WIRBELSÄULENSTABILISIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER SCHRAUBE SOWIE EXTERNEN FACETTEN- UND/ODER LAMINAFIXERUNG[2013/20]
English:SPINAL STABILIZATION SYSTEM UTILIZING SCREW AND EXTERNAL FACET AND/OR LAMINA FIXATION[2013/20]
French:SYSTÈME DE STABILISATION SPINALE À VIS ET FIXATION SUR FACETTE EXTERNE ET/OU LAME VERTÉBRALE[2013/20]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2012National basic fee paid 
20.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/20]
11.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2015Fee for grant paid
30.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15188588.6  / EP2992845
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2014
Opposition(s)12.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.06.2011
AL11.11.2015
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
BG11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
CH30.06.2016
FR30.06.2016
GB30.06.2016
IE30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
LU30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU30.06.2011
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
BG11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
CH30.06.2016
FR30.06.2016
GB30.06.2016
IE30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
LU30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/31]HU30.06.2011
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
CH30.06.2016
FR30.06.2016
GB30.06.2016
IE30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
LU30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/29]HU30.06.2011
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
CH30.06.2016
FR30.06.2016
GB30.06.2016
IE30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
LU30.06.2016
Former [2018/28]HU30.06.2011
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
CH30.06.2016
FR30.06.2016
GB30.06.2016
IE30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/25]AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
CH30.06.2016
FR30.06.2016
GB30.06.2016
IE30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2009112264  (LINS ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,12-16,18-21,24,27,28,30-36,43-47,49-53,55-57 * paragraphs [0023] - [0032] - [0038] - [0042]; figures 1,2,7,9,10 * [Y] 10,11,22,23,37-39,52;
 [Y]EP2111811  (BIEDERMANN MOTECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10,11,37-39 * paragraphs [0018] - [0024] - [0048]; figures 1,7 *;
 [X]US2006200149  (HOY ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14-17,19,20,26,29-43,45-48,54 * paragraphs [0012] - [0041] - [0050] - [0056]; figures 1,4 *;
 [X]US2005131406  (REILEY MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,12,14-17,19-21,24,25,30-33,43-47,50,51,54 * paragraphs [0084] - [0095]; figures 9,15-18 *;
 [X]US2006293663  (WALKENHORST JARED W [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12-14,31-35,43-45 * paragraphs [0080] - [0087] - [0119] - [0120]; figures 4,9,28-31,35 *;
 [Y]US2007043357  (KIRSCHMAN DAVID L [US]) [Y] 22,23,52 * abstract *
by applicantUS2010114175
 US2010100135
 US2010094356
 US2010087859
 US2010082065
 US2010076490
 US2009318980
 US2009312763
 US2009312798
 US2009312800
 US2009306671
 US2009299412
 US2009275954
 US2009275992
 US2009275993
 US2009275994
 US2009270929
 US2009264928
 US2009248082
 US2009248089
 US2009234394
 US2009234397
 US2009216273
 US2009192551
 US2009187219
 US2009177205
 US2009163920
 US2009131986
 US2009125066
 US2009112264
 US2009105819
 US2009099602
 US2009093851
 US2009076551
 US2009054903
 US2009036926
 US2009036927
 US2009036986
 US2008275454
 US2008262555
 US2008255618
 US2008255619
 US2008255622
 US2008255666
 US2008255667
 US2008234758
 US2007233092
 US2007233093
 US2007112428
 US2006264953
 US2006212034
 US2006200149
 US2006111779
 US2006111780
 US2005267480
 US2005149030
 US2005124993
 US2004254575
 US2004087948
 US2003208202
 US6648893
 US7608094
 US7708761
 US7563275
 US7699878
 US7452369
 US7223269
 US6540747
 US6485518
 US7717943
 US7662172
 US7604655
 US7686835
 US2010204738
 US2006155278
 US2007123862
 US2007093827
 US2007123867
 US2008071277
 US2008097457
 US2008249576
 US2010063553
 US2010179603
 US2010152788