Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2596060

EP2596060 - PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.05.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
26.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Pontaccio 10
20121 Milano / IT
[2018/47]
Former [2013/22]For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Soperga, 14/A
20127 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / CIARAFONI, Marco
Via Risorgimento 84
I-44123 Ferrara / IT
02 / MASSARI, Paola
Via E. Farolfi 3
I-44121 Ferrara / IT
03 / RATHINAKUMAR, Manikandan
Basell International Trading FZE
Office No. 619 Gate A
Bldg. Phase 6
293611 Dubai / AE
04 / BIONDINI, Gisella
Via dei Gigli 16
I-44015 Portomaggiore / IT
05 / CAPUTO, Tiziana
via Carlo Mayr 52
I-44121 Ferrara / IT
 [2013/22]
Representative(s)Sacco, Marco
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
[N/P]
Former [2013/22]Sacco, Marco
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
Application number, filing date11734139.622.07.2011
WO2011EP62591
Priority number, dateUS20100400178P23.07.2010         Original published format: US 400178 P
EP2010017059023.07.2010         Original published format: EP 10170590
[2013/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012010678
Date:26.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2596060
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012
[2013/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2596060
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/12, C08F297/08
[2013/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROPYLENPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2013/22]
English:PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS[2013/22]
French:COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES À BASE DE PROPYLÈNE[2013/22]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2013National basic fee paid 
11.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/22]
29.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2014Fee for grant paid
15.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/15]
Opponent(s)01  24.02.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
07.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition03.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1518/17
08.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.07.2011
AL28.05.2014
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MK28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
TR28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
GB22.07.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU22.07.2011
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MK28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
TR28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
GB22.07.2015
Former [2016/33]HU22.07.2011
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
TR28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
GB22.07.2015
Former [2016/32]HU22.07.2011
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
GB22.07.2015
Former [2016/28]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
GB22.07.2015
Former [2016/23]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
GB22.07.2015
Former [2016/22]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2016/21]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
IE22.07.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU22.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/13]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
LU22.07.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
ES28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2014/52]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY28.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2006067052  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-7 * examples 3,4 *;
 [A]WO2006037705  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-7 * example 1; claims 1-3 *
by applicantWO2005014713
 WO2006037705
 EP0045977
 EP0361494
 EP0728769
 EP1272533
 WO0063261
 US4399054
 US4469648
 EP0395083
 WO9844001
 EP0782587
 EP1012195