Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2526791

EP2526791 - KNEE JOINT SUPPORTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kowa Company, Ltd.
6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-8625 / JP
[2018/39]
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
Kowa Company, Ltd.
6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-8625 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUO, Kazuhiko
c/o KOWA COMPANY LTD.
4-14, Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8433 / JP
02 / KOGA, Hidefumi
c/o IIDAKUTSUSHITA Co. Ltd. 138
Gose-shi Nara 639-2200 / JP
 [2018/39]
Former [2012/48]01 / MATSUO Kazuhiko
c/o KOWA COMPANY LTD.
4-14, Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8433 / JP
02 / KOGA Hidefumi
c/o IIDAKUTSUSHITA Co. Ltd. 138
Gose-shi Nara 639-2200 / JP
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2018/39]
Former [2012/48]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date11734800.324.01.2011
[2018/39]
WO2011JP51220
Priority number, dateJP2010001251222.01.2010         Original published format: JP 2010012512
[2012/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011090194
Date:28.07.2011
Language:JA
[2011/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2526791
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2526791
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.07.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A41D13/08, A41D13/00, A61F13/10
[2014/02]
Former International [2012/48]A41D13/00, A41D13/06, A61F5/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KNIEGELENKSTÜTZE[2012/48]
English:KNEE JOINT SUPPORTER[2012/48]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT DE L'ARTICULATION DU GENOU[2012/48]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2012Translation filed 
20.07.2012National basic fee paid 
20.07.2012Search fee paid 
20.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/48]
02.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2018Fee for grant paid
09.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2015
Opposition(s)27.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
25.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SI26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
LU24.01.2019
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/44]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
LU24.01.2019
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/40]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/24]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
NO26.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT26.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4492227  (SENN URS [CH] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 7;
 [X]US6149616  (SZLEMA INGEBORG [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-4,8 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US6063048  (BODENSCHATZ STEFAN G A [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]JP2007054126  (SAN ACE KK) [Y] 7 * figure 3 *
International search[A]JPH0370558  (TOKYO EIZAI LAB);
 [A]JPH0165021U  (KYOTO FIBER INDUSTRY CO., LTD.)
ExaminationUS5154690
by applicantJP2008106404