Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2593939

EP2593939 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ELECTRONIC SELL-THROUGH OF INTERACTIVE MULTIMEDIA CONTENT AUTHORED FOR DISTRIBUTION VIA PHYSICAL MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 23.05.2018  [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rovi Technologies Corporation
2160 Gold Street
San Jose CA 95002 / US
[2017/52]
Former [2017/16]For all designated states
Rovi Technologies Corporation
2 Circle Star Way
Santa Carlos, CA 94070 / US
Former [2013/21]For all designated states
Rovi Technologies Corporation
2830 De La Cruz Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KNIGHT, Anthony, David
1321 Bottle Brush Lane
San Jose CA 95118 / US
02 / LEWIS, Ian, Michael
39 CrossRoad
Chosley
Wallingord
Oxfordshire OX10 9PE / GB
03 / DEVITT, Andrew, Maurice
49D Grange Park
Ealing
London W5 3PR / GB
 [2013/21]
Representative(s)Pisani, Diana Jean
Haley Guiliano International LLP
Central Court
25 Southampton Buildings
London WC2A 1AL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Thorniley, Peter
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2014/17]Thorniley, Peter
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2013/21]Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Siebensterngasse 54
1071 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date11735744.213.07.2011
WO2011US43923
Priority number, dateUS20111318236513.07.2011         Original published format: US201113182365
US20111318237613.07.2011         Original published format: US201113182376
US20100364001P13.07.2010         Original published format: US 364001 P
[2013/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012009485
Date:19.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2593939
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012
[2013/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/034, G11B27/32, H04L29/06, H04N7/173, H04N7/01
[2013/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/21]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN ELEKTRONISCHEN VERKAUF VON FÜR DIE VERTEILUNG ÜBER PHYSISCHE DATENTRÄGER ERSTELLTEN INTERAKTIVEN MULTIMEDIA-INHALTEN[2013/21]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ELECTRONIC SELL-THROUGH OF INTERACTIVE MULTIMEDIA CONTENT AUTHORED FOR DISTRIBUTION VIA PHYSICAL MEDIA[2013/21]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA VENTE PROMOTIONNELLE ÉLECTRONIQUE DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA INTERACTIF CRÉÉ POUR LA DISTRIBUTION PAR LE BIAIS DE SUPPORTS PHYSIQUES[2013/21]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2013National basic fee paid 
16.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/21]
27.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/21]
04.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/21]
05.01.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2006165381  (ECKLEDER ANDREAS [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,17,18,21,23-29,31,47,48,51,53-59,61,77,78,81,83-86,102,103,105,107,109-111 * the whole document * [I] 19,20,22,30,49,50,52,60,79,80,82,104,106,108;
 [A]US2008313680  (SUZANNE BENOIT [FR] ET AL) [A] 1,20,31,50,61,80,86,106 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008108966  (MACROVISION CORP [US]; BASILE CARMEN LAURA [GB]; RECKLESS JONNY BOYD [) [A] 1,17-31,47-61,77-86,102-111 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "How to rip DVDs in Windows/Mac using Handbrake", (20081003), URL: http://www.my-guides.net/en/content/view/111/26/, (20110830), XP055005809 [A] 19,20,22,49,50,52,79,80,82,104,106,108 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Bruce Lawson, "Accessible HTML5 Video with JavaScripted captions", (20100113), URL: http://dev.opera.com/articles/view/accessible-html5-video-with-javascripted-captions/, (20110826), XP055005689 [A] 20,50,80,106 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Simon Pieters, "Everything you need to know about HTML5 video and audio", (20100303), URL: http://my.opera.com/core/blog/2010/03/03/everything-you-need-to-know-about-html5-video-and-audio-2, (20110826), XP055005682 [A] 1,17-31,47-61,77-86,102-111 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Ian Hickson ET AL, "HTML5 - A vocabulary and associated APIs for HTML and XHTML", (20100304), pages 1 - 569, URL: http://www.w3.org/TR/2010/WD-html5-20100304/Overview.html, (20110824), XP055005565 [A] 1,17-31,47-61,77-86,102-111 * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [03.1] * * paragraph [3.2.5] * * paragraph [04.3] * * paragraph [04.8] * * paragraph [4.11.3] - paragraph [4.11.5] *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Any DVD Converter", (20091230), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20091230041557/http://any-video-converter.com/products/for_dvd/, (20110825), XP055005595 [A] 1,17-31,47-61,77-86,102-111 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Screenshot- Any DVD Converter", (20091230), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20091230070300/http://any-video-converter.com/products/for_dvd/screenshot.php, (20110825), XP055005596 [A] 1,17-31,47-61,77-86,102-111 * the whole document *
 [AP]  - Tony Knight, "Metadata & the Supply Chain", (20110324), URL: http://www.media-tech.net/fileadmin/templates/association/pdf/enews/Las_Vegas_2011/Rovi Slides (MediaTech2011.pdf, (20110824), XP055005557 [AP] 1,17-31,47-61,77-86,102-111 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Mark Pilgrim, "Video on the Web", (20091116), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20091116135139/http://diveintohtml5.org/video.html, (20110826), XP055005690 [A] 1,17-31,47-61,77-86,102-111 * the whole document *