Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2627972

EP2627972 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE RANGE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.05.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/34]For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MAYINGER, Josef
Am Sportplatz 3
86653 Daiting / DE
 [2013/34]
Representative(s)Herbst, Matthias Heinz
Audi AG
Patentabteilung
I/EZ-14
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/34]Herbst, Matthias Heinz
Audi AG
Patentabteilung
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Application number, filing date11735998.416.07.2011
WO2011EP03559
Priority number, dateDE2010104838713.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010048387
[2013/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012048766
Date:19.04.2012
Language:DE
[2012/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2627972
Date:21.08.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012
[2013/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/34
[2013/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ERMITTELN DER REICHWEITE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS[2013/34]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE RANGE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE[2013/34]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'AUTONOMIE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2013/34]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2013National basic fee paid 
13.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/34]
24.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.03.2016
22.03.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination21.05.2016Appeal received No.  T2041/16
12.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
06.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010138142  (PEASE KAREN [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0010] , [0011] , [0017] , [0022] , [0023] , [0024] , [0032] , [0037] , [0043] , [0047] , [0055] , [0056] , [0062] , [0074] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0084] * [I] 4;
 [A]JP2006306231  (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0006] *
by applicantDE10302504
 DE10029886