Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2531255

EP2531255 - ANGIOCATHETER DEVICE WITH IMPROVED SAFETY FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.06.2013  [2013/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spurbeck, William Paul
10393 E. Avalon Park
Tucson, AZ 85747 / US
For all designated states
Banister, Mark
6550 E. Miramar Drive
Tucson, AZ 85715 / US
[2012/50]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/50]
Representative(s)Beyer, Carsten
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Beyer
Kaiserring 48
68161 Mannheim / DE
[2012/50]
Application number, filing date11737633.527.01.2011
WO2011US22707
Priority number, dateUS20100406016P22.10.2010         Original published format: US 406016 P
US20100337155P01.02.2010         Original published format: US 337155 P
[2012/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011094397
Date:04.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2531255
Date:12.12.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011
[2012/50]
Search report(s)International search reportUS04.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/04
[2012/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/50]
Extension statesBA31.07.2012
ME31.07.2012
TitleGerman:ANGIOKATHETERVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTEN SICHERHEITSFUNKTIONEN[2012/50]
English:ANGIOCATHETER DEVICE WITH IMPROVED SAFETY FEATURES[2012/50]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANGIO-CATHÉTER PRÉSENTANT DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE SÉCURITÉ AMELIORÉES[2012/50]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2012National basic fee paid 
31.07.2012Search fee paid 
31.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/50]
03.05.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201303   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5700248  (LOPEZ GEORGE A [US]);
 [Y]EP0451040  (PARKER ROBERT L [US], et al);
 [Y]US7037292  (CARLYON JAMES L [US], et al);
 [Y]US5832971  (YALE MARK C [US], et al)