blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2528615 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2528615



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 421
24.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 4
24.04.2019 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
27.03.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
18.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
18.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.11.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.10.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
25.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
25.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
28.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
09.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
11.03.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
01.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.03.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
01.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 22
01.03.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
01.03.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
01.03.2013 Description Search / examination 2
01.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.11.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.11.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.10.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.10.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.10.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
02.10.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.09.2012 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.09.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
21.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.08.2012 Annex Search / examination 2
21.08.2012 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 28
21.08.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.08.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.08.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
15.08.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
11.06.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.08.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 97
04.08.2011 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 28
04.08.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
04.08.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 111
02.08.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1