blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2528615


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.11.2018 First examination report
31.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.09.2015 Change - classification published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
25.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
30.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2013 Change - extension states published on  01.05.2013  [2013/18]
04.03.2013 Amendment by applicant
30.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.11.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
02.11.2012 Request for examination filed published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
26.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
11.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
17.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
05.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication