blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2528615
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9572861Global Dossier 21.02.2017B2
US2016317612 03.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201414163882 24.01.2014
US29877610 27.01.2010
US201615094522 08.04.2016
US201113015455 27.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9334309Global Dossier 10.05.2016B2
US2014206603 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414163882 24.01.2014
US29877610 27.01.2010
US201113015455 27.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8637456Global Dossier 28.01.2014B2
US2011201547 18.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
US29877610 27.01.2010
US201113015455 27.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6210685BGlobal Dossier 11.10.2017B2
JP2013518121 20.05.2013A
Priority number Date
US29877610 27.01.2010
WO2011US22775 27.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2528615Global Dossier 28.10.2015A4
EP2528615 05.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US29877610 27.01.2010
WO2011US22775 27.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011210840B 11.12.2014B2
AU2011210840 06.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
US29877610 27.01.2010
WO2011US22775 27.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2787940 04.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
US29877610 27.01.2010
WO2011US22775 27.01.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011094445Global Dossier 04.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
US29877610 27.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2017125062Global Dossier 20.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US29877610 27.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2015166396Global Dossier 24.09.2015A
Priority number Date
US29877610 27.01.2010