blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2528615

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure18.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Entry into regional phase21.08.2012National basic fee paid 
21.08.2012Search fee paid 
21.08.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2012Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.12.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:05.12.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20120821
 
Event date:01.05.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:28.10.2015 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20150928
 
Event date:28.10.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 38/16 20060101AFI20150922BHEP
 
Event date:12.12.2018 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20181107