Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2528615

EP2528615 - ENGINEERED POLYPEPTIDE AGENTS FOR TARGETED BROAD SPECTRUM INFLUENZA NEUTRALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/49]For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute Of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139-4307 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SASISEKHARAN, Ram
4 Duval Way
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
02 / VISWANATHAN, Karthik
35 Fremont Street Apt. 2-1
Arlington, MA 02474 / US
03 / SOUNDARARAJAN, Venkataramanan
60 Wadsworth Street Apt. 18-H
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
04 / RAGURAM, Sasi
34 Vliet Drive
Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US
05 / SASISEKHARAN, Viswanathan
2130 Massachusetts Avenue Apt. 7B
Cambridge, MA 02140 / US
06 / SUBRAMANIAN, Vidya.
156 Summer Street, Apt 414.
Somerville, MA 02143 / US
 [2012/49]
Representative(s)Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/49]Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date11737670.727.01.2011
WO2011US22775
Priority number, dateUS20100298776P27.01.2010         Original published format: US 298776 P
[2012/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011094445
Date:04.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2528615
Date:05.12.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011
[2012/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.08.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/16
[2012/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/49]
TitleGerman:MANIPULIERTE POLYPEPTIDMITTEL FÜR GEZIELTE INFLUENZA-NEUTRALISIERUNG IN EINEM BREITEN SPEKTRUM[2012/49]
English:ENGINEERED POLYPEPTIDE AGENTS FOR TARGETED BROAD SPECTRUM INFLUENZA NEUTRALIZATION[2012/49]
French:AGENTS POLYPEPTIDIQUES TECHNIQUES POUR LA NEUTRALISATION DE LA GRIPPE À LARGE SPECTRE CIBLÉE[2012/49]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2012National basic fee paid 
21.08.2012Search fee paid 
21.08.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/49]
25.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]WO0155315  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010004195  (SASISEKHARAN RAM [US], et al)
 [Y]  - SUI ET AL., "Structural and functional bases for broad-spectrum neutralization of avian and human influenza A viruses", NAT STRUCT MOL BIOL, (200903), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 265 - 273, XP002538005

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nsmb.1566
 [Y]  - THROSBY ET AL., "Heterosubtypic neutralizing monoclonal antibodies cross-protective against H5N1 and H1N1 recovered from human IgM+ memory B cells", PLOS ONE, (200812), vol. 3, no. 12, page E3842, XP002541082

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0003942
 [Y]  - EKJERT ET AL., "Antibody recognition of a highly conserved influenza virus epitope: implication for universal prevention and therapy", SCIENCE, (20090410), vol. 324, pages 246 - 251, XP009144786