Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2601822

EP2601822 - METHOD TO FORM SOLDER DEPOSITS AND NON-MELTING BUMP STRUCTURES ON SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MATEJAT, Kai-Jens
Teltower Straße 27
14109 Berlin / DE
02 / LAMPRECHT, Sven
Kaiserin-Augusta-Allee 86c
10589 Berlin / DE
03 / EWERT, Ingo
Alsterweg 57b
14167 Berlin / DE
04 / SCHOENENBERGER, Catherine
6
Impasse des Iris
F-68510 Rantzwiller / FR
05 / KRESS, Jürgen
Grenzacher Weg 42
CH-4125 Riehen / CH
 [2013/24]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]Wonnemann, Jörg , et al
Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Markenabteilung Erasmussstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date11737966.929.07.2011
WO2011EP63141
Priority number, dateEP2011016001428.03.2011         Original published format: EP 11160014
EP2010017161202.08.2010         Original published format: EP 10171612
[2013/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012016932
Date:09.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2601822
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012
[2013/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/24, H05K3/34, H05K3/40, H01L23/498, H01L21/48, H01L23/00
[2019/17]
Former International [2013/24]H05K3/24, H05K3/34, H05K3/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BILDEN VON LÖTABLAGERUNGEN UND NICHTSCHMELZENDEN DÄMPFERSTRUKTUREN AUF SUBSTRATEN[2013/24]
English:METHOD TO FORM SOLDER DEPOSITS AND NON-MELTING BUMP STRUCTURES ON SUBSTRATES[2013/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE DÉPÔTS DE BRASURE ET DE STRUCTURES BOSSELÉES QUI NE FONDENT PAS SUR DES SUBSTRATS[2013/24]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2012National basic fee paid 
23.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.06.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/24]
06.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2019
27.03.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US2006202331  (HU WEN-HUNG [TW]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038]; figures 4A-4I * [A] 8,9,12-16 [Y] 4,5,10,11;
 [IPAY]EP2244285  (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [IP] 1,2,8,9,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 3,6,7,10-14 [Y] 4,5;
 [X]EP2180770  (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,12-14 * figures 1,9; claims 1-10 *;
 [YA]US2006079081  (HSU SHIH-PING [TW], et al) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,6-16;
 [Y]EP1542520  (JSR CORP [JP]) [Y] 10,11 * paragraphs [0075] - [0077] - [0094] - [0096] *;
 [A]US2009205854  (LEE DONG-GYU [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7098126
 US5203075
 US5492266
 US5828128
 US5391514
 US5480835
 US2006219567
 EP2180770
 EP0616053
 US5503877
 US5693209
 EP1390568
 US3993491
 US3993848
    - Printed Circuits Handbook, MCGRAW HILL, pages 28.5 - 28.9,30.
    - Printed Circuits Handbook, MCGRAW HILL, pages 28.9,30. - 30.3
    - JORDAN, THE ELECTRODEPOSITION OF TIN AND ITS ALLOYS, (1995), pages 71 - 84
    - JORDAN, THE ELECTRODEPOSITION OF TIN AND ITS ALLOYS, (1995), pages 373 - 377