Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2588620

EP2588620 - PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF BUTANOL OR ACETONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Celtic Renewables Limited
5th Floor, 125 Princes Street
Edinburgh, Scotland EH2 4AD / GB
[2013/19]
Inventor(s)01 / WHITE, Samantha Jane
18B Dalkeith Road
Edinburgh EH16 5BS / GB
02 / LEIPER, Kenneth Alexander
3F2 23 Millar Crescent
Edinburgh EH10 5HN / GB
03 / TANGNEY, Martin
11 Ogilvie Terrace
Edinburgh EH11 1NS / GB
04 / MESSENGER, Sandra
32 Pinchmill Way
Sharnbrook Bedfordshire MK44 1PJ / GB
 [2013/23]
Former [2013/19]01 / WHITE, Samantha Jane
18B Dalkeith Road
Edinburgh EH16 5BS / GB
02 / LEIPER, Kenneth Alexander
3F2 23 Millar Crescent
Edinburgh EH10 5HN / GB
03 / TANGNEY, Martin
11 Ogilvie Terrace
Edinburgh EH11 1NS / GB
04 / MESSENGER, Sandra
8 Lee Farm Cottages
Sharnbrook Bedfordshire MK44 1LH / GB
Representative(s)Ede, Eric , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2016/38]
Former [2013/19]Thomson, James B.
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date11738779.530.06.2011
[2016/38]
WO2011GB51237
Priority number, dateGB2010001107901.07.2010         Original published format: GB 201011079
[2013/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012001416
Date:05.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2588620
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012
[2013/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2588620
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/16, C12P7/28, C12P7/36, C12P7/34, C12F3/10, C10L1/02
[2016/14]
Former International [2013/19]C12P7/16, C12P7/36, C12P7/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BUTANOL ODER ACETON[2013/19]
English:PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF BUTANOL OR ACETONE[2013/19]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE BUTANOL OU D'ACÉTONE[2016/14]
Former [2013/19]PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE BUTANOL OU D'ACÉTONE
Entry into regional phase18.01.2013National basic fee paid 
18.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/19]
18.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2016Fee for grant paid
12.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2016
Opposition(s)22.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/11]EE21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/52]EE21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/32]EE21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/13]LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/11]LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT21.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[YA]GB190601962  (SAVILLE S 1902 LTD, et al) [Y] 18,19,24,25,29,32,33,36,37 * the whole document * [A] 1,4,5,9,11,12,15,16;
 [YA]GB190702591  (REYNAUD GEORGES [FR], et al) [Y] 18,19,22-25,30,31,37 * the whole document * [A] 1,4,10,16;
 [XPA]WO2010083652  (BREEZE GLOBAL INC, et al) [XP] 17-22,24,27,32,35,36,38 * page 2, line 11 - page 4, line 20 * * examples 1,2,7,8,13,14,15,16,22 * [A] 1-4,7,11,14,15;
 [XAY]  - JP2005328801, "Method for producing butanol", EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (20051202), XP002657827 [X] 17,18,38 * abstract * [A] 5,13 [Y] 19-22,26,27,31,34,35
 [XAY]  - EZEJI T ET AL, "Fermentation of dried distillers' grains and solubles (DDGS) hydrolysates to solvents and value-added products by solventogenic clostridia", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, GB, vol. 99, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.BIORTECH.2007.09.032, ISSN 0960-8524, (20080801), pages 5232 - 5242, (20071029), XP022654843 [X] 17,38 * abstract * * page 5239 - page 5241 * [A] 1-3,7,11,12,14,15 [Y] 19-21,27,32,33,35,36

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2007.09.032
 [XAY]  - JONES D T ET AL, "Acetone-butanol fermentation revisited", MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19861201), vol. 50, no. 4, ISSN 0146-0749, pages 484 - 524, XP002425366 [X] 17,38 * page 488, column 2 - page 496, column 2 * [A] 1 [Y] 19-21,26,27,32-36
 [YA]  - TSHITEYA ET AL, "Fuel production from a brewery residue", ENERGY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 10, no. 12, doi:10.1016/0360-5442(85)90141-0, ISSN 0360-5442, (19851201), pages 1299 - 1306, (19851201), XP023643399 [Y] 19,23,24,29 * abstract * [A] 1,4,9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0360-5442(85)90141-0
 [YA]  - TOKUDA MASATSUGU ET AL, Methane fermentation of pot ale from a whisky distillery after enzymatic or microbial treatment, JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING, VOL. 85, NR. 5, PAGE(S) 495-501, (1998), ISSN 0922-338X, XP002657828 [Y] 23,24,30,34 * abstract * * page 495 * [A] 1,4,7,10,13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0922-338X(98)80068-8
 [A]  - URE A M ET AL, "THE DE TOXIFICATION OF POT ALE AND OTHER COPPER-RICH EFFLUENTS BY CEMENTATION OF COPPER ON ALUMINUM METAL", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (1982), vol. 33, no. 8, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 711 - 714, XP002657829 [A] 1,8,10,19,22-24 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.2740330805
 [YPA]  - SCHENKMAN, L., "Whiskey in the car?", SCIENCE, (20100827), vol. 329, page 999, XP002657830 [YP] 19 * the whole document * [A] 1