blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2531543

EP2531543 - HIGHLY FUNCTIONAL EPOXIDIZED RESINS AND COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.02.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NDSU Research Foundation
Dept. 4400 P.O. Box 6050
Fargo, ND 58108-6050 / US
[2012/50]
Inventor(s)01 / WEBSTER, Dean, C.
2434 Parkview Drive
Fargo, ND 58103 / US
02 / SENGUPTA, Partha, Pratim
2801 9th Street N. Apt. 301
Fargo, ND 58102 / US
03 / CHEN, Zhigang
1928 50th Street S.
Fargo, ND 58103 / US
04 / PAN, Xiao
200 University Village
Fargo, ND 58102 / US
05 / PARAMARTA, Adlina
218 University Village
Fargo, ND 58102 / US
 [2012/50]
Representative(s)Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstraße 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Jacobi, Markus Alexander
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2012/50]Jacobi, Markus Alexander
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date11740428.504.02.2011
[2019/15]
WO2011US23753
Priority number, dateUS20100302124P06.02.2010         Original published format: US 302124 P
US20100355487P16.06.2010         Original published format: US 355487 P
US20110435338P23.01.2011         Original published format: US 435338 P
US20100355453P16.06.2010         Original published format: US 355453 P
[2012/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011097484
Date:11.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2531543
Date:12.12.2012
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2012/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2531543
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.08.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2015
ClassificationIPC:C08G65/02
[2012/50]
CPC:
C08G59/027 (EP,US); C07D303/16 (EP,US); C08G59/02 (US);
C08G59/1438 (US); C08G59/1455 (US); C08G59/1466 (US);
C08G59/34 (US); C08G59/4207 (US); C08G59/4215 (US);
C08G59/4223 (US); C08L63/00 (US); C08L63/10 (US);
C09D163/00 (US); C09D163/08 (US); C09D175/08 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHFUNKTIONELLE EPOXIDIERTE HARZE UND BESCHICHTUNGEN[2012/50]
English:HIGHLY FUNCTIONAL EPOXIDIZED RESINS AND COATINGS[2012/50]
French:RÉSINES ÉPOXYDÉES HAUTEMENT FONCTIONNELLES ET REVÊTEMENTS CORRESPONDANTS[2012/50]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2012National basic fee paid 
06.09.2012Search fee paid 
06.09.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/50]
04.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2019Fee for grant paid
19.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2016
Opposition(s)13.01.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.02.2011
AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CY10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
MK10.04.2019
MT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU04.02.2011
AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CY10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
MT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/49]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
MC10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/25]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SI10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/17]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
TR10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/14]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
SM10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/11]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
EE10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
SK10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/10]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RO10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/09]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
CZ10.04.2019
DK10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/04]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
IS10.08.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2020/03]AL10.04.2019
AT10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/52]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL10.04.2019
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US3792041  (YAMAGISHI F, et al);
 [Y]US3870664  (FAULKNER RAYMOND NOEL);
 [A]US4517360  (VOLPENHEIN ROBERT A [US]);
 [Y]US4663072  (CHEUNG MO-FUNG [US]);
 [Y]US5318808  (CRIVELLO JAMES V [US], et al);
 [A]US5646226  (SACHINALA NAVZER D [US], et al);
 [Y]US6077879  (OHTSUKI NOBUAKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US6303777  (KAO JU-NAN [US], et al);
 [Y]US2003229224  (SCHAEFER JARED JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]US2006020062  (BLOOM PAUL D [US]);
 [X]US2009005508  (BLOOM PAUL D [US])
by applicantUS5318808
 US5349026
 US5371148
    - METZGER ET AL., C. R. CHIM., (2004), vol. 7, page 569
    - MEIER ET AL., CHEM. SOC. REV., (2007), vol. 36, page 1788
    - BAUMANN ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1998), vol. 27, page 41
    - BIERMANN ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2000), vol. 39, page 2206
    - KHOT ET AL., J. APPL. POLYM. SCI., (2001), vol. 82, page 703
    - F. W. LICHTENTHALER; S. PETERS, C. R. CHIM., (2004), vol. 7, pages 65 - 90
    - GU ET AL., J. COAT. TECHNOL., (2002), vol. 74, page 49
    - ZOU ET AL., MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (2005), vol. 206, page 967
    - ZOU, MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (2005), vol. 206, page 967
    - SANGERMANO ET AL., J. MATER. SCI., (2002), vol. 37, page 4753
    - CRIVELLO ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (1992), vol. 4, pages 692 - 699
    - ROSCH ET AL., POLYMER BULLETIN, (1993), vol. 31, pages 679 - 685
    - ANNELISE ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (2002), vol. 79, pages 797 - 802
    - BAJPAI ET AL., PIGMENT & RESIN TECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 33, page 160
    - PRANTIL, B, JOURNAL OF OIL AND COLOUR CHEMIST'S ASSOCIATION, (2000), vol. 83, page 460
    - BUNKER ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 40, pages 451 - 458
    - Raw Materials Index, NATIONAL PAINT & COATINGS ASSOCIATION
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.