Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2575825

EP2575825 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING DEPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.10.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alexander Vuckovic, M.D., LLC
115 Mill Street
Belmont, MA 02478 / US
[2013/15]
Inventor(s)01 / VUCKOVIC, Alexander
630 Rutland Street
Carlisle, MA 01741 / US
 [2013/15]
Representative(s)Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date11742864.911.02.2011
WO2011US24530
Priority number, dateUS20100303837P12.02.2010         Original published format: US 303837 P
[2013/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011100550
Date:18.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2575825
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011
[2013/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.12.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7076, A61K31/455, A61K31/4415, A61K31/519, A61K31/495, A61P25/18
[2013/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/15]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEPRESSION[2013/15]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING DEPRESSION[2013/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAITER LA DÉPRESSION[2013/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2012National basic fee paid 
20.12.2012Search fee paid 
20.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/15]
24.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
27.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.06.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination13.08.2018Appeal received No.  T2682/18
19.10.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.10.2016Request for further processing filed
06.10.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.10.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
LU, CZ, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
20.12.2012Request for further processing filed
20.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
20.12.2012Request for further processing filed
20.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2013Decision despatched
20.12.2012Request for further processing filed
20.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
20.12.2012Request for further processing filed
20.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
20.12.2012Request for further processing filed
20.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2013Decision despatched
20.12.2012Request for further processing filed
20.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201303   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003148991  (HAHNLEIN WOLFGANG P [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-4,9,13 * example 2 * [I] 5-8,10-12;
 [XI]WO9937155  (NUTRAMAX LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9,13 * claims 1,3,9,14 * [I] 4-7,10-12;
 [I]US2008274175  (SCHRAMM JACK H [US] ET AL) [I] 1-13 * claims 1,9-12,33 *;
 [I]US2004043013  (MCCLEARY EDWARD LARRY [US]) [I] 1-13 * claim 16 *;
 [I]US6093703  (LA GRECA PIETRO [IT]) [I] 1-13 * claim - *;
 [I]  - JEROME SARRIS ET AL, "Major depressive disorder and nutritional medicine: a review of monotherapies and adjuvant treatments", NUTRITION REVIEWS, (20090301), vol. 67, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1753-4887.2009.00180.x, ISSN 0029-6643, pages 125 - 131, XP055088451 [I] 1-13 * page 126 * * page 127, paragraph l - page 128, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1753-4887.2009.00180.x
 [I]  - FUGH-BERMAN A ET AL, "DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS AND NATURAL PRODUCTS AS PSYCHOTERAPEUTIC AGENTS", PSYCHOSOMATIC MEDICINE, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990901), vol. 61, no. 5, ISSN 0033-3174, pages 712 - 728, XP000890189 [I] 1-13 * page 713, column 1 * * page 721 * * page 722, column 1 * * page 723, column 2 *
International search[Y]EP1275399  (AMANDA J. KILIAAN AND ROBERT J.J. HAGEMAN);
 [Y]US2004157783  (ANDREW MCCADDON);
 [A]US2002182196  (EDWARD LARRY MCCLEARY);
 [A]US2008214492  (CURT HENDRIX)