Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2575825 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2575825



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 348
24.01.2020 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
23.01.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
17.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.01.2020 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
15.01.2020 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
13.01.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.01.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.12.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.08.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.11.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.11.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.10.2018 Claims Appeal 8
19.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.10.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
13.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.07.2018 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.07.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
13.06.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
13.06.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 2
13.06.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.04.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
27.03.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
08.12.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.12.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
20.11.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.11.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.09.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
27.07.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
02.06.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.04.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
29.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
24.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
17.12.2013 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 4
28.11.2013 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 5
14.11.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
02.10.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
02.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.04.2013 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.04.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
13.03.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.03.2013 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
04.03.2013 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
27.02.2013 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
26.02.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.12.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
20.12.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
22.10.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 2
17.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.09.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.08.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
22.06.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
29.12.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
29.12.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
07.09.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55
18.08.2011 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 68