Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2575825


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.12.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
01.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.11.2018 Change: Appeal number
22.10.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
14.08.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
14.08.2018 New entry: Appeal number
12.06.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.06.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
02.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.11.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.10.2016 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
11.10.2016 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
11.10.2016 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
10.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.07.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.05.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.03.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.11.2015 First examination report
03.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
05.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2013 Supplementary search report published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
02.10.2013 Amendment by applicant
19.04.2013 Change - extension states published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
03.04.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
03.04.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
12.03.2013 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
08.03.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
08.03.2013 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
06.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
06.03.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
05.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
20.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
20.02.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
20.02.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
13.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
13.02.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
13.02.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
22.10.2012 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
21.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
30.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
08.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
02.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication