Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2570124

EP2570124 - OLEUROPEIN COMPOSITIONS FOR HEALING WOUNDS AND ULCERS IN ELDERLY PEOPLE AND/OR DIABETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanyres Sur S. L.
C/Cronista Rey Díaz, 2
14006 Córdoba / ES
For all designated states
Servicio Andaluz de Salud
Avda. de la Constitución 18
41001 Sevilla / ES
For all designated states
Quesper, R&D, S.L.
Avda. Conde de Vallellano, 13, 6°-1
14004 Madrid / ES
[2017/09]
Former [2016/44]For all designated states
Sanidad Y Residencias 21, S.A.
Cronista Rey Díaz 2
14006 Córdoba / ES
For all designated states
Servicio Andaluz de Salud
Avda. de la Constitución 18
41001 Sevilla / ES
For all designated states
Quesper, R&D, S.L.
Avda. Conde de Vallellano, 13, 6°-1
14004 Madrid / ES
Former [2013/29]For all designated states
Sanidad Y Residencias 21, S.A.
Cronista Rey Díaz 2
14006 Córdoba / ES
For all designated states
Servicio Andaluz de Salud
Avda. de la Constitución 18
41001 Sevilla / ES
For all designated states
Quesper, R&D, S.L.
Avda. Conde de Vallellano, 13, 6°-1
14004 Madrid / ES
Former [2013/12]For all designated states
Sanidad Y Residencias 21, S.A.
Cronista Rey Díaz 2
14006 Córdoba / ES
For all designated states
Servicio Andaluz de Salud
Avda. de la Constitución 18
41001 Sevilla / ES
For all designated states
Gabinete Quesper, S.C.
Avda. Conde de Vallellano 13, 6º-1
14004 Córdoba / ES
Inventor(s)01 / QUESADA GÓMEZ, José Manuel
Avda. Conde de Vallellano 13, 6º-1
E-14004 Córdoba / ES
02 / SANTIAGO MORA, Raquel María
Cuesta de la Pólvora 19, 4º, 23-L
E-14010 Córdoba / ES
03 / CASADO DÍAZ, Antonio
Plaza Mayor 19
E-14650 Bujalance (Córdoba) / ES
 [2013/12]
Representative(s)Carlos Hernando, Borja , et al
Garrigues IP, S.L.P.
Hermosilla, 3
28001 Madrid / ES
[2014/24]
Former [2013/12]Gonzalez-Alberto Rodriguez, Natalia
GARRIGUES IP, S.L.P. Hermosilla, 3
28001 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date11743251.813.05.2011
[2016/44]
WO2011ES70343
Priority number, dateWO2010ES7032714.05.2010         Original published format: PCT/ES2010/070327
[2013/12]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011141611
Date:17.11.2011
Language:ES
[2011/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2570124
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2570124
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/351, A61K31/7004, A61K36/63, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61P17/02, A61K47/10, A61K47/32, A61K31/7048
[2016/22]
Former International [2013/12]A61K31/351, A61K31/7004, A61K36/63, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61P17/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:OLEUROPEIN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WUNDEN UND GESCHWÜREN BEI ÄLTEREN MENSCHEN UND/ODER DIABETIKERN[2016/22]
English:OLEUROPEIN COMPOSITIONS FOR HEALING WOUNDS AND ULCERS IN ELDERLY PEOPLE AND/OR DIABETICS[2013/12]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'OLEUROPÉINE POUR LA CICATRISATION DE PLAIES ET D'ULCÈRES CHEZ DES PERSONNES ÂGÉES ET/OU DIABÉTIQUES[2013/12]
Former [2013/12]OLEUROPEIN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HEILUNG VON WUNDEN UND GESCHWÜREN BEI ÄLTEREN PATIENTEN UND/ODER DIABETIKERN
Entry into regional phase20.11.2012Translation filed 
20.11.2012National basic fee paid 
20.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/12]
24.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2013Observations by third parties
10.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2016Fee for grant paid
19.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2014
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
02.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.05.2011
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CY02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU13.05.2011
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/13]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/35]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/28]AT02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/13]deleted
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006137100  (MED CARE S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11-14,16,17 * page 1, lines 5-10 * * page 9, line 36 - page 10, line 2 * * page 10, lines 20-21; example 1 * * example 3 *;
 [X]WO2004096119  (EGER OLIVE OIL PRODUCTS INDUST [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,13-15,17 * page 1, lines 5-21 * * page 3, lines 5-7, 15-22 * * page 5, lines 3-5 * * page 11, lines 11, 19-21 *;
 [X]WO2005063195  (MED CARE S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,9,13,14,16,17 * page 2, lines 7-19 * * page 7, lines 26-30 * * page 10, line 33 - page 11, line 2 * * example 5 * * page 17, lines 4-6, 12-13, 18, 22-23 *;
 [X]US2004097428  (HAMDI HAMDI K [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11,13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] - [0 64] , [0 69] *;
 [XD]MX2007016417  (VOLANTE MARIO ALBERTO CANAMAR [MX]) [XD] 1,2,11,13,14 * abstract * * pages 9-11 *;
 [ID]WO2007051829  (BELMAC S A LAB [ES], et al) [ID] 1-17 * page 2, lines 25-33 * * page 3, lines 8-14, 18, 35 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, lines 13, 23 * * examples 2-5 *;
 [I]US2004101507  (PREDOVAN JANCO [US]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [0 25] , [0 27] , [0 31] - [0032] *;
 [I]DE20301401U  (ECKARDT RAINER [DE]) [I] 1-17 * page 6 * * page 8, paragraphs 3-4 * * page 25, paragraph 2 * * page 26 *;
 [XDP]WO2010070183  (SANIDAD Y RESIDENCIAS 21 S A U [ES], et al) [XDP] 1-17 * page 1, lines 5-22 * * page 10, lines 2-6, 11-13 *;
 [XP]WO2010130869  (SANIDAD Y RESIDENCIAS 21 S A [ES], et al) [XP] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-21 * * page 5, lines 23-25, 27-28 * * page 6, lines 1-2, 4-5 * * page 8, lines 12-14, 20-28 * * page 17, line 25 - page 18, line 13 *
ExaminationUS2006287234
 WO2007006484
    - GALIANO ROBERT D ET AL, "Topical vascular endothelial growth factor accelerates diabetic wound healing through increased angiogenesis and by mobilizing and recruiting bone marrow-derived cells.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY JUN 2004, (200406), vol. 164, no. 6, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1935 - 1947
by applicantUS2004097428
 US2002110600
 KR20070065955
 ES2274721
 US2003004117
 WO2010070183
 MX2007016417
    - VISIOLI F; POLI A; GALLI C, "Antioxidant and other biological activities of phenols from olives and olive oil", MED.RES.REV., (2002), vol. 22, pages 65 - 75
    - VISIOLI F; BELLOSTA S; GALLI C, "Oleuropein, the bitter principles of olives, enhances nitric oxide production by mouse macrophages", LIFE. SCI., (1998), vol. 62, pages 541 - 546
    - CARLUCCIO MA; SICULELLA L; ANCORA MA; MASSARO M; SCODITTI E; STORELLI C; VISIOLI F; DISTANTE A; DE CATERINA R, "Olive oil and red wine antioxidant polyphenols inhibit endothelial activation: antiatherogenic properties of Mediterranean diet phytochemicals", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL., (2003), vol. 23, pages 622 - 629
    - OWEN RW; GIACOSA A; HULL WE; HAUBNER R; WURTEIE G; SPIEGELHALDER B; BARTSCH H, "Olive oil consumption and health: the possible role of antioxidants", LANCET ONCOL., (2000), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S1470-2045(00)00015-2, pages 107 - 112, XP004814045

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(00)00015-2
    - TRIPOLI E; GIAMMANCO M; TABACCHI G; DI MAJO D; GIAMMANCO S; LA GUARDIA M, "The phenolic composition of olive oil: structure, biological activity, and beneficial effects on human health", NUTR. RES. REV., (2005), vol. 18, pages 98 - 112, XP009070306
    - FREDICKSON WR, F; S GROUP, "Method and composition for Antiviral Therapy with Olive Leaves", US PATENT 2000, vol. 6, no. 117, page 884
    - ANDREADOU , SIGALA F; ILIODROMITIS EK; PAPAEFTHIMIOU M; SIGALAS C; ALIGIANNIS N; SAVVARI P; GORGOULIS V; PAPALABROS E; KREMASTINOS, "Acute doxorubicin cardiotoxicity is successfully treated with the phytochemical oleuropein through suppression of oxidative and nitrosative stress", J. MOL. CELL. CARDIO., (2007), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1016/j.yjmcc.2006.11.016, pages 549 - 558, XP005911023

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yjmcc.2006.11.016
    - ANDREADOU , LLIODROMITIS EK; MIKROS E; CONSTANTINOU M; AGALIAS A; MAGIATIS P; SKALTSOUNIA AL; KAMBER E; TSANTILIL-KAKOULIDOU A; KR, "The olive constituent oleuropein exhibits anti-ischemic, antioxidative, and hypolipidemic effects in anesthetized rabbits", J. NUT., (2006), vol. 136, pages 2213 - 2219
    - DAVID W. VOIGT ET AL., "Economic Study of Collagen-Glycosaminoglycan Biodegradable Matrix for Chronic Wounds", WOUNDS, (2006), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 1 - 7
    - ROWE DW ET AL., "Abnormalities in proliferation and protein synthesis in skin fibroblast cultures from patients with diabetes mellitus", DIABETES, (1997), vol. 26, pages 284 - 290
    - STEPHEN A. BRIGIDO ET AL., "Use of an Acellular Flowable Dermal Replacement Scaffold on Lower Extremity Sinus Tract Wounds", FOOT & ANKLE SPECIALIST, (2009), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 67 - 72
    - MCLENNAN S ET AL., "Molecular aspects of wound healing", PRIMARY INTENTION, (2006), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 8 - 13
    - E. LINDEN ET AL., "Endothelial Dysfunction in Patients with Chronic Kidney Disease Results from Advanced Glycation End Products (AGE)-Mediated Inhibition of Endothelial Nitric Oxide Synthase through RAGE Activation", CLIN. J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL, (2008), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 691 - 698
    - GALKOWSKA H, "Chemokines, cytokines and growth factors in keratinocytes and dermal endothelial cells in the margin if chronic diabetic foot ulcers", WOUND REPAIR REGEN, (2006), vol. 14, pages 558 - 565
    - NEIL BENNETT ET AL., "Growth factors and wound healing: Part II. Role in normal and chronic wound healing", AM J SURG, (1993), vol. 166, pages 74 - 81, XP026409249
    - DEBBIE SHARMAN, "Moist wound healing: a review of evidence, application and outcome", THE DIABETIC FOOT, (2003), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 112 - 120
    - LAKOVOS N NOMIKOS ET AL., "Protective and Damaging Aspects of Healing: A Review", WOUNDS, (2006), vol. 18, no. 7, pages 177 - 185
    - HAROLD BREM; MARJANA TOMIC-CANIC, "Cellular and Molecular basis of wound healing in diabetes", JCI, (2007), vol. 117, no. 5, pages 1219 - 1222
    - GALKOWSKA H. ET AL., "Chemokines, cytokines and growth factors in keratinocytes and dermal endothelial cells in the margin of chronic diabetic foot ulcers", WOUND REPAIR REGEN, (2006), vol. 14, pages 558 - 565
    - SPENCER S; SPENCER, SUE A, "Pressure relieving interventions for preventing and treating diabetic foot ulcers", COCHRANE DATABASE SYSTEM REV., (2000), vol. 3
    - SCHAFFER M; BONGARTZ M; FISHER S; PROKSCH B; VIEBAHN R, "Nitric oxide restores impaired healing in normoglycemiaemic diabetic rats", J. WOUND CARE, (200707), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 311 - 6
    - ZAMBONI WA; WONG HP; STEPHENSON LL; PFEIFER MA, "Evaluation of hyperbaric oxygen for diabetic wounds: a prospective study", UNDERSEA HYPERB MED, (199709), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 175 - 9
    - KRANKE P; BENETT M; ROECKL-WIEDMANN; DEBUS S, "Hyperbaric oxygen therapy for chronic wounds", COCHRANE DATABASE SYS REV, (2004), no. 2
    - SNYDER RJ; TREATMENT OF NONHEALING ULCERS WITH ALLOGRAFTS, CLIN.DERMATOL., (2005), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 388 - 95
    - GARDNER SE; FRANTZ RA; DOEBBELING BN, "The validity of the clinical sings and symptoms used to identify localized chronic wound infection", WOUND REPAIR REGEN., (2001), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 178 - 86
    - GRAY D; COOPER P, "Nutrition and wound healing: what is the link?", J WOUND CARE., (2001), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 86 - 9
    - JESSUP RL, "What is the best method for assessing the rate of wound healing? A comparison of 3 mathematical formulas", ADV SKIN WOUND CARE., (2006), vol. 19, pages 138 - 47
    - "Metodos de evaluación de las úlceras. Criterios predictivos de curacion", MARINELLO J, Utceras de la extremidad inferior, (2005), pages 275 - 85
    - BUNTINX F; BECKERS H; DE KEYSER G; FLOUR M; NISSEN G ET AL., "Inter-observer variation in the assessment of skin ulceration", J WOUND CARE., (1996), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 166 - 70
    - PALOMAR F; FORNES B; TORNERO A; MUNOZ A, "Escala de Valoracion FED-PALLA de la piel perilesional", ENFERMERIA DERMATOLóGICA, (2007), vol. 1, pages 36 - 8
    - WAGNER FW, "The dysvascular foot: a system for diagnosis and treatment", FOOT ANKLE, (1981), vol. 2, pages 64 - 122
    - "Guidelines for Pressure Ulcer Treatment", European Pressure Ulcer Advisory Panel
other   - "NUSKHA TILA", TKDL, Database accession no. BA4/128A, XP003035416
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, IKSEER AZAM, (1872), vol. IV, page 10
    - "ZIMAAD BARAI QUROOH-E-KHABEESA", TKDL, Database accession no. JA3/244B, XP003035417
    - ZIYA AL-ABDULLAH IBN BAITAR, DIN AL-JAAM'E-LI-MUFRADAAT-AL-ADVIA-WAL-AGHZIA, (1874), vol. II, page 174
    - "ZAITOON", TKDL, Database accession no. AH1/342, XP003035418
    - ABU ALI IBN-E-SINA, AL-QAANOON-FIL-TIBB, (1987), vol. II, pages 213 - 215
    - "SAMAGH-E- ZAITOON BARAE QUROOH", TKDL, Database accession no. MH6/126D, XP003035419
    - ZIYA AL- DIN ABDULLAH IBN AL- BAITAR, AL-JAAM'E-LI-MUSFRADAAT-AL-ADVIA-WAL-AGHZIA, (1874), vol. III, page 87
    - "ZAITOON", TKDL, Database accession no. JA3/244, XP003024312
    - ZIYA AL- DIN ABDULLAH IBN AL- BAITAR, AL-JAAM'E-LI-MUSFRADAAT-AL-ADVIA, (1874), vol. II
    - "MARHAM-E-KHALL/JAALINOS BARA-E-QUROOH", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/4111, XP003035420
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, ILAAJ-AL-AMRAAZ, (1921), page 352
    - "MATBOOKH SHANJAR BARAE HARQ", TDKL, Database accession no. MH6/92E, XP003035421
    - ZIYA AL- DIN ABDULLAH IBN AL- BAITAR, AL-JAAM'E-LI-MUSFRADAAT-AL-ADVIA-WAL-AGHZIA, (1874), vol. III, page 70
    - "NUSKHA DAWA", TKDL, Database accession no. BA4/1731C, XP003035422
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, IKSEER AZAM, (1872), vol. IV, page 283
    - "ZIMAAD-E-SMAGHE ZAITOON", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/730D, XP003035423
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL KAN, KHAZAAIN-AL-ADVIA, (1911), vol. II, page 727