Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2600915

EP2600915 - FLEXIBLE WATER VAPOUR BARRIER TUBE FOR PACKAGING PURPOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebæk / DK
[2013/24]
Inventor(s)01 / NIELSEN, Henrik Lindenskov
Aeblevangen 120
DK-2765 Smoerum / DK
 [2013/24]
Application number, filing date11743426.605.08.2011
WO2011DK50305
Priority number, dateDK2010007035105.08.2010         Original published format: DK 201070351
[2013/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012016571
Date:09.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2600915
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012
[2013/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2600915
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61L29/14, A61M25/00
[2013/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASSERDAMPFSPERRSCHLAUCH FÜR VERPACKUNGSZWECKE[2013/24]
English:FLEXIBLE WATER VAPOUR BARRIER TUBE FOR PACKAGING PURPOSE[2013/24]
French:TUBE FLEXIBLE ÉTANCHE À LA VAPEUR D'EAU UTILISABLE EN TANT QU'EMBALLAGE[2013/24]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2013National basic fee paid 
05.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/24]
12.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.01.2015Fee for grant paid
20.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.09.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.12.2015  08.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
Høiberg P/S, et al
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
 02  04.12.2015  09.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dentsply IH AB
Aminogatan 1
431 21 Mölndal / SE
Opponent's representative
Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/02]
Opponent(s)01  03.12.2015  08.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
Høiberg A/S, et al
St. Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
 02  04.12.2015  09.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dentsply IH AB
Aminogatan 1
431 21 Mölndal / SE
Opponent's representative
Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
18.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.09.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/08]
09.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.10.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.08.2011
AL04.03.2015
AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE05.08.2015
LU05.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2017/39]HU05.08.2011
AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE05.08.2015
LU05.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/22]AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE05.08.2015
LU05.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/37]AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE05.08.2015
LU05.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE05.08.2015
LU05.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU05.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/18]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU05.08.2015
Former [2016/17]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU05.08.2015
Former [2016/12]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/07]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/03]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/50]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/49]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/41]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/39]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
RS04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/38]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/37]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/36]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/35]ES04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/33]ES04.03.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9930761  (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,11,13-15,17,18 * claims 1,2,7 *;
 [X]GB2319507  (RUSCH MANUFACTURING [GB]) [X] 1,11-13,16-18 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 2 *;
 [XI]CA2116009  (BRYAN JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,11 * claims 1,6 * [I] 1,3-9,11;
 [X]WO9747349  (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,11,13-18 * page 6, line 13 - page 6, line 29 * * claims 1,9 *;
 [X]EP0679506  (SABIN CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4,11 * claims 1,2,6 *;
 [X]WO9819729  (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,10-18 * page 3, line 16 - line 32 * * claim 1 *
by applicantEP2106821
 WO2007050685
OppositionUS2001001443
 GB1299826
 WO2007050685
 WO8404037
 EP1373377
 WO9615757
 EP0369788
 US2007051417
 EP1605196
 WO9807390
 US6634498
 WO9819729
 WO03092779
 WO2009068043
 WO9747349
 US2007066963
 WO0030575
 EP2106821
 EP0679506
 US2006025753
 EP1023882
    - ELSAYED ABDEL-BARY, Handbook of Plastic Films, ISBN 1-85957-338-x, XP055261835
    - "Effects of Temperature and Humidity on the Barrier Properties of Biaxially-orientedPolypropylene and Polyvinyl Alcohol Films", Journal of Applied Packaging Research, (20140000), vol. 6, no. 1, XP055261842
    - "Prediction of WVTR with General Regression Models", Lahtinen and Kuusipalo, XP055261872