Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2726914

EP2726914 - TEMPORARY PHOTOCHROMIC PATCH FOR AN OPHTHALMIC LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Essilor International (Compagnie Générale d'Optique)
147, rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
[2014/19]
Inventor(s)01 / CHIU, Hao-Wen
5424 Stag Thicket Lane
Palm Harbor, FL 34685 / US
02 / LOCKWOOD, Matthew, James
4104 14th Avenue East
Bradenton, FL 34208 / US
 [2014/19]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon Feray Lenne Conseil
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date11745595.601.07.2011
[2015/51]
WO2011US42741
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013006153
Date:10.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2726914
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013
[2014/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2726914
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B1/04, G02B5/23
[2014/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEMPORÄRES PHOTOCHROMES PFLASTER FÜR EIN BRILLENGLAS[2014/19]
English:TEMPORARY PHOTOCHROMIC PATCH FOR AN OPHTHALMIC LENS[2014/19]
French:PIÈCE PHOTOCHROMIQUE TEMPORAIRE POUR UNE LENTILLE OPHTALMOLOGIQUE[2014/19]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2013National basic fee paid 
12.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/19]
25.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2015Fee for grant paid
21.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2015
Opposition(s)19.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.07.2011
AL16.12.2015
AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
TR16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
IE01.07.2016
LU01.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU01.07.2011
AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
TR16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
IE01.07.2016
LU01.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/38]HU01.07.2011
AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
IE01.07.2016
LU01.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/31]HU01.07.2011
AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
IE01.07.2016
LU01.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU01.07.2011
AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
IE01.07.2016
LU01.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/41]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
IE01.07.2016
LU01.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/22]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/16]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/49]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT16.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[IY]WO2005019281  (ADHESIVES RES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-6,9-12,16 * page 9, line 5 - line 8; claim 7 * * page 10 - page 11; figure 1 * [Y] 7,13;
 [A]US4261656  (WU SHY-HSIEN) [A] 10,11 * figure 2; claim 15 *;
 [YA]US2004096666  (KNOX CAROL L [US], et al) [Y] 7,13 * example 1 * [A] 10,11;
 [A]JPS6411185  (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2009089137  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
by applicantUS2007112103