EP2638444 - INTELLIGENT VISUALISATION IN THE MONITORING OF PROCESS AND/OR SYSTEM VARIABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIOUA, Moncef Bahnhofstr. 59 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
HOLLENDER, Martin Am Rebgarten 50 69221 Dossenheim / DE | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Marks, Frank, et al ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/21] | Kock, Ina ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Straße 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/38] | Kock, Ina ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Straße 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11748275.2 | 19.08.2011 | [2016/21] | WO2011EP04175 | Priority number, date | EP20100014593 | 13.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10014593 | [2013/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012062387 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2638444 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2638444 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
G05B23/0216 (EP,US);
G01R13/00 (US);
G05B23/0272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE VISUALISIERUNG BEI DER ÜBERWACHUNG VON PROZESS- UND/ODER ANLAGEGRÖSSEN | [2013/38] | English: | INTELLIGENT VISUALISATION IN THE MONITORING OF PROCESS AND/OR SYSTEM VARIABLES | [2013/38] | French: | VISUALISATION INTELLIGENTE DANS LA SURVEILLANCE DE GRANDEURS DE PROCESSUS ET/OU D'INSTALLATIONS | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 16.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2011 | AL | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | IS | 25.05.2016 | IT | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | MT | 25.05.2016 | NL | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | RS | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | AT | 19.08.2016 | IE | 19.08.2016 | LU | 19.08.2016 | GB | 25.08.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
AT | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
GB | 25.08.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6564119 (VACULIK VIT [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 2-6 * * column 10, line 21 - column 11, line 50 *; | [A]US7000193 (IMPINK JR ALBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2006136175 (SUZUKI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,13 * the whole document * [I] 5-8,11,12; | [I]WO2008145154 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009177439 (SAMPLES PAUL K [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * |