Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2587927

EP2587927 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COMPLETELY REMOVING AT LEAST ONE PART OF THE BREAST CARTILAGE FROM A POULTRY CARCASS THAT IS FREE OF BREAST MEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG
Geniner Strasse 249
23560 Lübeck / DE
[2013/19]
Inventor(s)01 / LANDT, Andreas
Plönerstr. 27
23554 Lübeck / DE
 [2013/19]
Representative(s)Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Stork Bamberger
Patentanwälte
Postfach 73 04 66
22124 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date11748643.123.08.2011
WO2011EP64484
Priority number, dateDE2010104766030.09.2010         Original published format: DE102010047660
[2013/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012041610
Date:05.04.2012
Language:DE
[2012/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2587927
Date:08.05.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012
[2013/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2587927
Date:04.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/23]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2587927
Date:03.12.2014
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:A22C21/00
[2013/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VOLLSTÄNDIGEN LÖSEN ZUMINDEST EINES TEILS DES BRUSTKNORPELS VON EINER VOM BRUSTFLEISCH BEFREITEN GEFLÜGELKARKASSE[2013/19]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COMPLETELY REMOVING AT LEAST ONE PART OF THE BREAST CARTILAGE FROM A POULTRY CARCASS THAT IS FREE OF BREAST MEAT[2013/19]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À DÉTACHER INTÉGRALEMENT AU MOINS UNE PARTIE DU CARTILAGE DE POITRINE À PARTIR D'UNE CARCASSE DE VOLAILLE LIBÉRÉE DE SON BLANC[2013/19]
Entry into regional phase30.01.2013National basic fee paid 
30.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/19]
12.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2014Fee for grant paid
09.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.03.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Marel Stork Poultry Processing B.V.
Handelstraat 3
5831 AV Boxmeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/15]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
10.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.06.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1860/17
09.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.08.2011
AL04.06.2014
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
MK04.06.2014
MT04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
TR04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
GB23.08.2015
AT23.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU23.08.2011
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
MK04.06.2014
MT04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
TR04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
GB23.08.2015
AT23.08.2016
Former [2017/49]HU23.08.2011
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
MT04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
TR04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
GB23.08.2015
AT23.08.2016
Former [2016/34]HU23.08.2011
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
MT04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
TR04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
GB23.08.2015
Former [2016/33]HU23.08.2011
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
MT04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
TR04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2016/32]HU23.08.2011
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
MT04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2016/31]BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
MT04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2016/28]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
MT04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2016/22]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
SM04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/37]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
IE23.08.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/36]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/22]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/20]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/19]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
LU23.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/18]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/12]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY04.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010081366  (DE VOS FERDINAND ALLARD [NL] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0061]; figures 9-11 *;
 [A]DE202009017070U  (JANSSEN JOERG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US6283847  (BERRY ALLAN TODD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * column 7, paragraph 3 - column 11, paragraph 1; figures 1-6 *