blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2591026 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2591026



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 886
10.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
29.03.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 3
23.03.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
18.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
14.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
14.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.01.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 14
07.01.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 17
17.11.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.11.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.11.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.11.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 100
01.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 89
28.01.2015 Description Search / examination 89
28.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.09.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.09.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
28.08.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 4
11.07.2014 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
01.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
28.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
28.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.05.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 4
29.04.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.01.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.01.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
11.10.2013 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
03.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.04.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.02.2013 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
20.02.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.02.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.02.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.02.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.02.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
04.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
04.02.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
04.02.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.01.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
16.11.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.05.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
18.05.2012 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
17.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.02.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 7
07.02.2012 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 56
01.02.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
01.02.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 109
12.01.2012 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 103
23.09.2011 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
18.08.2011 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.08.2011 Claims International Searching Authority 6
18.08.2011 Description International Searching Authority 87
18.08.2011 Drawings International Searching Authority 9