blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2591026


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
28.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
24.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
10.03.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
08.07.2016 Change - representative
01.04.2016 (Expected) grant published on  04.05.2016  [2016/18]
25.03.2016 Change - applicant published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
25.03.2016 Change - inventor published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
16.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.03.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.01.2016 Change - representative
16.11.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.01.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.10.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.09.2014 Change - applicant published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
04.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.01.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.01.2014 First examination report
06.09.2013 Change - extension states published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
04.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.04.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
12.04.2013 Request for examination filed published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
05.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2013 Amendment by applicant
18.05.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
26.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication