blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2591026 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP11748721 EP11748722



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012004746Global Dossier 18.05.2012A3
WO2012004746 15.03.2012A8
WO2012004746 12.01.2012A2
Priority number Date
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
IN1938MU2010 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012004744Global Dossier 18.05.2012A3
WO2012004744 29.03.2012A8
WO2012004744 12.01.2012A2
Priority number Date
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
IN1938MU2010 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017181847Global Dossier 29.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715459103 15.03.2017
WO2011IB52976 05.07.2011
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
IN1938MU2010 
US201313808614 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016220348Global Dossier 04.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2011IB52978 05.07.2011
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
US201615095078 10.04.2016
IN1938MU2010 
US201313808624 07.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9622853Global Dossier 18.04.2017B2
US2013109779 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011IB52976 05.07.2011
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
IN1938MU2010 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9310624Global Dossier 12.04.2016B2
US2013107201 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011IB52978 05.07.2011
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
IN1938MU2010 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2591025Global Dossier 05.10.2016B1
EP2591025 15.05.2013A2
Priority number Date
WO2011IB52976 05.07.2011
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
IN1938MU2010 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2591026Global Dossier 04.05.2016B1
EP2591026 15.05.2013A2
Priority number Date
WO2011IB52978 05.07.2011
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
IN1938MU2010 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2585632T 07.10.2016T3
Priority number Date
WO2011IB52978 05.07.2011
IN2888MU2010 
IN273MU2011 
IN1938MU2010