Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2591026

EP2591026 - REFRACTIVE-DIFFRACTIVE OPHTHALMIC DEVICE AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dave, Jagrat Natavar
Block No. 310
Village Sim of Dabhasa
Taluka-Padra
Vadodara, Gujarat 319440 / IN
[2016/17]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Dave, Jagrat Natavar
Village Sim of Dabhasa
Taluka-Padra
Vadodara
319440 Gujarat / IN
Former [2013/20]For all designated states
Polymer Technologies International (EOU)
Block No. 310/C of Village Sim of Dabhasa, Ta.
Padra, Dist.
319 440 Vadodara, Gujarat / IN
Inventor(s)01 / ARGAL, Sanjay Ram Swaroop
A/401 Nakshtra Heights
Sama Savli Road
Baroda
Vadodara Gujarat 390008 / IN
02 / HUSSAIN, Munavvar Tahir
B1-23 Yogi Kutir Society
Tandalja Road
Vadodara Gujarat 390020 / IN
03 / MALSHE, Vinod Chintamani
Flat Nos.33-34 Building No 10
Kamdhenu
Kalptaru Constructions
Hari Om Nagar
Mulund (East) Mumbai Maharastra 400081 / IN
04 / PATIL, Abhijit Bhagvat
R.H. 13 Pratibha C.H.S.
Sector - 2A
Airoli
Navi Mumbai Maharastra 400708 / IN
 [2016/17]
Former [2013/20]01 / ARGAL, Sanjay Ram Swaroop
A/401 Nakshtra Heights
Sama Savli Road
Baroda
Vadodara Gujarat 390002 / IN
02 / HUSSAIN, Munavvar Tahir
B1-23 Yogi Kutir Society
Tandalja Road
Vadodara Gujarat 390020 / IN
03 / MALSHE, Vinod Chintamani
Flat Nos.33-34 Building No 10
Kamdhenu
Kalptaru Constructions
Hari Om Nagar
Mulund (East) Mumbai Maharastra 400081 / IN
04 / PATIL, Abhijit Bhagvat
R.H. 13 Pratibha C.H.S.
Sector - 2A
Airoli
Navi Mumbai Maharastra 400708 / IN
Representative(s)Gevers & Orès
41 avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/18]Gevers & Orès
36 rue de Saint-Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2013/20]Noel, Chantal Odile , et al
Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date11748722.305.07.2011
[2016/18]
WO2011IB52978
Priority number, dateIN2011MUM027301.02.2011         Original published format: IN MU02732011
IN2010MUM288818.10.2010         Original published format: IN MU28882010
IN2010MUM193805.07.2010         Original published format: IN MU19382010
[2013/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012004746
Date:12.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2591026
Date:15.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012
[2013/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2591026
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08F220/30, C08L33/14, C08K5/00, G02B1/04, A61L27/16, A61F2/16, G02C7/06, G02B5/18, G02C7/04
[2013/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:REFRAKTIV-DIFFRAKTIVE OPHTHALMISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG[2013/20]
English:REFRACTIVE-DIFFRACTIVE OPHTHALMIC DEVICE AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR PRODUCING SAME[2013/20]
French:DISPOSITIF OPHTALMIQUE RÉFRACTIF/DIFFRACTIF ET COMPOSITIONS UTILES POUR SA FABRICATION[2013/20]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2013National basic fee paid 
04.02.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/20]
28.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2016Fee for grant paid
14.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2014
Opposition(s)07.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.07.2011
AL04.05.2016
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
LU05.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU05.07.2011
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
LU05.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2018/31]HU05.07.2011
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
LU05.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2018/28]HU05.07.2011
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
LU05.07.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
LU05.07.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/17]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/03]FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP2045648  (ALCON INC [CH]) [Y] 1,2,5-23 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0019]; figures 1A,1B *;
 [Y]FR2930731  (ACRYLIAN SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMPL [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5-23 * page 1 * * page 6, paragraph 7 * * page 7, paragraphs 1,4 * * page 8, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 5 * * example 1 *;
 [Y]EP0485197  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [Y] 1,2,5-23 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, lines 30-46, paragraph 2 * * page 4, lines 4-20 * * example 2; compound 8 *;
 [IY]JPH067424  ;
 [A]US5470932  (JINKERSON DAVID L [US]) [A] 2,6 * column 1, lines 5-20 * * column 8, lines 45-55 * * examples 3-5 *
 [IY]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 10, Database accession no. 1994-077184, XP002664738 & JPH067424 A 19940118 (KOWA CO LTD) [I] 3,4 * abstract * [Y] 2,5-23
by applicantUS4338005
 US5089023
 US5699142
 US6536899
 US4881805
 US5344476
 US7377641
 US4162122
 US4210391
 US4340283
 US4995714
 US4995715
 US4881804
 US5017000
 US5054905
 US5056908
 US5120120
 US5121979
 US5121980
 US5144483
 US5117306
 US5076684
 US5116111
 US5129718
 US4637697
 US4641934
 US4655565
 EP1194797
 WO9411764
 WO9907756
 US7585900
 US5331073
 US5674960
 EP1030194
 US6653422
 US5693095
 US2008139769
 WO2004029675
 US7304117
 US5433746
 US2005258096
 US2004031275
 US2003116873
 US5603774
 US5290892
 US5403901
 US5716403
 US5861031
 US4304895
 US4528311
 US2003130460
 US2009132039
 US2008269884
 US2008021129
 US2001014824
 WO0118079
 WO2006021438
 WO2006087042
 WO2009137525
 WO2009120511
 WO2008011566
 WO2008011564
 WO0118078
 WO2004011764
 WO2004031275
 WO2009104516
 WO2006095750
 WO2009025399
 JP2003119226
 KR20090047478
 EP1857477
 CN101137684
 US5234990
 US5578676
 US2007204412
 US7691918
 US3479345
 US2003153512
 US2006276536
 US2007060644
 US2008200478
 US2010010232
 US2010048901
 US2010087527
 IN19382010
 IN28882010
 WO2010IB53818