Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2614105

EP2614105 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROCESSING-STABLE POLYAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/29]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GRÜTZNER, Rolf-Egbert
Hauptstr. 9
67283 Obrigheim / DE
02 / KEELAPANDAL RAMAMOORTHY, Shankara Narayanan
Augustaanlage 51
68165 Mannheim / DE
03 / EL-TOUFAILI, Faissal-Ali
An der Froschlache 19
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / GERSTLAUER, Achim
Mannheimerstrasse 39
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
05 / STAMMER, Achim
Buttstädter Str. 6
67251 Freinsheim / DE
 [2013/29]
Representative(s)Jacobi, Markus Alexander , et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstraße 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date11749194.431.08.2011
WO2011EP64932
Priority number, dateEP2010017609310.09.2010         Original published format: EP 10176093
[2013/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012031950
Date:15.03.2012
Language:DE
[2012/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2614105
Date:17.07.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012
[2013/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2614105
Date:06.08.2014
Language:DE
[2014/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08G69/46
[2013/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERARBEITUNGSSTABILEM POLYAMID[2013/29]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROCESSING-STABLE POLYAMIDE[2013/29]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYAMIDE STABLE A LA MISE EN UVRE[2014/14]
Former [2013/29]PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYAMIDE STABLE À LA MISE EN UVRE
Entry into regional phase10.04.2013National basic fee paid 
10.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/29]
03.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2014Fee for grant paid
24.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.03.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.05.2015  12.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
INVISTA Technologies S.à.r.l.
Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen
Kreuzackerstrasse 9
9000 St. Gallen / CH
Opponent's representative
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2015/48]
Former [2015/24]
Opponent(s)01  06.05.2015   
INVISTA Technologies S.à.r.l.
Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen
Kreuzackerstrasse 9
9000 St. Gallen / CH
Opponent's representative
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
16.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1778/17
17.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1778/17
12.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2011
AL06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MK06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB31.08.2015
AT31.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU31.08.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MK06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB31.08.2015
AT31.08.2016
Former [2017/49]HU31.08.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB31.08.2015
AT31.08.2016
Former [2017/46]HU31.08.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB31.08.2015
Former [2016/34]HU31.08.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]HU31.08.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU31.08.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2016/28]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2016/22]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/51]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/37]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/27]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/22]CY06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT06.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[XD]US6268468  (ILG OTTO M [US], et al) [XD] 1-13 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0038094  (STAMICARBON [NL]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 33 - line 37 * * example -; claim - *
by applicantWO0204561
 US6268468
 EP1333049
    - R. VIEWEG, A. MÜLLER, Kunststoff-Handbuch Band VI, Polyamide, C.HANSER VERLAG, (1966), page 190FF
    - R. VIEWEG, A. MÜLLER, Kunststoff-Handbuch Band VI, Polyamide, C.HANSER VERLAG, (1966), vol. VI, page 193
    - R. VIEWEG, A. MÜLLER, Kunststoff-Handbuch Band VI, Polyamide, C.HANSER VERLAG, (1966), vol. VI, page 194