blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2598906 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2598906



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 269
22.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.10.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.09.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.09.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.07.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
29.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.06.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.06.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
29.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.05.2017 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
16.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
16.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
05.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
29.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.08.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.10.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Description Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.10.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.06.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 2
25.10.2013 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
13.06.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
13.06.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.06.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
13.06.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
13.06.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
08.05.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.04.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.03.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
05.03.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
27.11.2012 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
25.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.10.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
25.10.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.02.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
22.02.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
02.02.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
02.02.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
06.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
06.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
06.12.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
28.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
28.07.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
28.07.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
28.07.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 18
28.07.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4