blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2598906


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
24.08.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
23.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
15.09.2017 (Expected) grant published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
11.09.2017 Change - representative
01.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.07.2017 Change - applicant published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
30.06.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.04.2017 Change - classification published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
14.04.2017 Change - classification published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
05.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.06.2015 First examination report
01.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.10.2013 Change - extension states published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
02.08.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2013 Amendment by applicant
03.05.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
03.05.2013 Request for examination filed published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
21.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
17.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication