blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2598906
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9462168Global Dossier 04.10.2016B2
US2013120565 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102010038591 28.07.2010
WO2011EP63056 28.07.2011
DE102010041390 24.09.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2598906Global Dossier 18.10.2017B1
EP2598906 05.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102010038591 28.07.2010
WO2011EP63056 28.07.2011
DE102010041390 24.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012013760Global Dossier 02.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
DE102010038591 28.07.2010
DE102010041390 24.09.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102010041390 07.12.2017B4
DE102010041390 02.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
DE102010038591 28.07.2010
DE102010041390 24.09.2010