Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2598906

EP2598906 - LIGHT PROPAGATION TIME CAMERA SYSTEM HAVING SIGNAL PATH MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
pmdtechnologies ag
Am Eichenhang 50
57076 Siegen / DE
[2017/34]
Former [2013/23]For all designated states
IFM Electronic GmbH
Friedrichstr. 1
45128 Essen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WILKS, Ralph
Schussenstraße 13/1
88074 Meckenbeuren / DE
02 / DAMHOFER, Bernd
Gartenstraße 24
88069 Tettnang / DE
 [2013/23]
Representative(s)Schuhmann, Jörg
Ifm electronic gmbh
Ifm-Straße 1
88069 Tettnang / DE
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date11749367.628.07.2011
[2017/42]
WO2011EP63056
Priority number, dateDE2010104139024.09.2010         Original published format: DE102010041390
DE2010103859128.07.2010         Original published format: DE102010038591
[2013/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012013760
Date:02.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2598906
Date:05.06.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012
[2013/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2598906
Date:18.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/36, G01S17/89, G01S7/497, G01S7/491, G01S17/10
[2017/20]
Former International [2013/23]G01S7/483, G01S7/491, G01S7/497, G01S17/10, G01S17/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTLAUFZEITKAMERASYSTEM MIT SIGNALPFADUEBERWACHUNG[2013/23]
English:LIGHT PROPAGATION TIME CAMERA SYSTEM HAVING SIGNAL PATH MONITORING[2013/23]
French:SYSTÈME DE CAMÉRA À TEMPS DE PROPAGATION DE LA LUMIÈRE AVEC SURVEILLANCE DU PARCOURS DU SIGNAL[2013/23]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2012National basic fee paid 
25.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/23]
13.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2017Fee for grant paid
19.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2015
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
MT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/43]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/39]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/23]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE102004037137  (PMD TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * figure 1 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0043] , [0048] * * claim 2 * [I] 3-5,7-11;
 [A]US4600299  (ABSHIRE JAMES B [US]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1 * * abstract *;
 [A]US2004085526  (GOGOLLA TORSTEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * figure 1 * * abstract *;
 [A]US6463393  (GIGER KURT [CH]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1 * * abstract *
by applicantEP1777747
 US6587186
 DE19704496