EP2605707 - CLUTCH RELEASE MECHANISM FOR VASCULAR CLOSURE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical Puerto Rico LLC Valle Tolima Industrial Park Lot 14, B Street Caguas 00725 / PR | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEGELS, Zachary, J. 4856 4th Avenue South Minneapolis MI 55419 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/26] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11749582.0 | 18.08.2011 | WO2011US01451 | Priority number, date | US20100375361P | 20.08.2010 Original published format: US 375361 P | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012023983 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2605707 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2605707 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B17/0483 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00623 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00654 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00659 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00778 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0404 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSLÖSEMECHANISMUS FÜR EINE GEFÄSSVERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/26] | English: | CLUTCH RELEASE MECHANISM FOR VASCULAR CLOSURE DEVICE | [2013/26] | French: | MÉCANISME DE DESSERRAGE POUR DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION VASCULAIRE | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 17.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2011 | AL | 08.10.2014 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | RS | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | SM | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/48] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2005085851 (FIEHLER WILLIAM [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5-12 * paragraphs [0041] , [0043]; figures 6-8 * [A] 3,4,13; | [A]WO2006037039 (SUTURA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0073] - [0075]; figures 3,4,6a,b *; | [A]EP1440661 (RADI MEDICAL SYSTEMS [SE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0052]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US6056768 (CATES CHRISTOPHER U [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 5-9 *; | [A]US2004267308 (BAGAOISAN CELSO J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 11a-f * | by applicant | US6179963 | US6090130 | US6045569 | US2005085851 | US7618438 | US7618436 |