Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2593498

EP2593498 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THERMOSETTING POLYMER, AND SUCH THERMOSETTING POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université de Picardie Jules Verne
Chemin du Thil
80025 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/21]For all designated states
Université de Picardie Jules Verne
Chemin du Thil
80025 Amiens Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / QUENEUDEC-T'KINT, Michèle
c/o Université de Picardie Jules Verne
Chemin du Thil
F-80025 Amiens Cedex / FR
02 / HOUESSOU KOFFI, Justin
c/o Université de Picardie Jules Verne
Chemin du Thil
F-80025 Amiens Cedex / FR
03 / MONTRELAY, Nicolas
c/o Université de Picardie Jules Verne
Chemin du Thil
F-80025 Amiens Cedex / FR
 [2013/21]
Representative(s)Schreiber, Ina , et al
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associes
96/98 Boulevard Carnot
59800 Lille / FR
[2013/21]
Application number, filing date11749869.111.07.2011
WO2011FR00408
Priority number, dateFR2010000294613.07.2010         Original published format: FR 1002946
[2013/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012007656
Date:19.01.2012
Language:FR
[2012/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2593498
Date:22.05.2013
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012
[2013/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2593498
Date:30.04.2014
Language:FR
[2014/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08H1/00, C08H1/02, C08H1/04, C08L89/00, C08L89/02, C08L97/02
[2013/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄRMEHÄRTENDEN POLYMERS UND DERARTIGES WÄRMEHÄRTENDES POLYMER[2014/02]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THERMOSETTING POLYMER, AND SUCH THERMOSETTING POLYMER[2013/21]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ÉLABORATION D'UN POLYMÈRE THERMODURCISSABLE ET UN TEL POLYMÈRE THERMODURCISSABLE[2013/21]
Former [2013/21]VERFAHRNE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄRMEHÄRTENDEN POLYMERS UND DERARTIGES WÄRMEHÄRTENDES POLYMER
Entry into regional phase11.01.2013National basic fee paid 
11.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/21]
09.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2014Fee for grant paid
18.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2013
Opposition(s)02.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.07.2011
AL30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MK30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU11.07.2011
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MK30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2016/33]HU11.07.2011
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU11.07.2011
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2016/28]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2016/22]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2016/21]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/36]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/20]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/13]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
LU11.07.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/08]CY30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/02]CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY30.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007104323  (BECKER & CO NATURINWERK [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, lines 5-14 * * page 7, lines 2-13 * * page 8, lines 9-20 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 3 * * page 14, lines 9-24 * * page 20, line 14 - page 21, line 7 *;
 [A]US2309380  (BROTHER GEORGE H, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]BE343473  (LA SOCIÉTÉ NOBEL FRANÇAISE) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantDE591540
 FR2850374
 FR2935375
 WO2002FR00714