Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2542442

EP2542442 - SINGLE SPEED TRANSMISSION FOR PLUGIN HYBRID ELECTRIC VEHICLE WITH TWO DISCONNECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.10.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borgwarner Inc.
Patent Department 3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
[2013/02]
Inventor(s)01 / KELLER, Robert F.
28546 Lancaster Drive
Chesterfield Michigan 48047 / US
 [2013/02]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date11751079.223.02.2011
WO2011US25825
Priority number, dateUS20100309022P01.03.2010         Original published format: US 309022 P
[2013/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011109196
Date:09.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2542442
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011
[2013/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.01.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60K20/02, F16H55/30, B60K6/50
[2013/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/02]
TitleGerman:GETRIEBE MIT FESTER DREHZAHL FÜR EIN PLUGIN-HYBRIDELEKTROFAHRZEUG MIT ZWEI TRENNSCHALTUNGEN[2013/02]
English:SINGLE SPEED TRANSMISSION FOR PLUGIN HYBRID ELECTRIC VEHICLE WITH TWO DISCONNECTS[2013/02]
French:TRANSMISSION À VITESSE UNIQUE POUR VÉHICULE HYBRIDE RECHARGEABLE AYANT DEUX MÉCANISMES DE DÉCONNEXION[2013/02]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2012National basic fee paid 
12.09.2012Search fee paid 
12.09.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2012Examination requested  [2013/02]
30.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2017
30.11.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
03.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination13.03.2018Appeal received No.  T1727/18
14.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE2943519  (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 3,10;
 [X]AT412861B  (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]; GETRAG INNOVATIONSCT GETRIEBE [DE]; THIEN ELECTRON) [X] 1,4-8,11-14 * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 5; figure 4 *;
 [A]US4646896  (HAMMOND JOHN E [GB] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 31; figure 1 *
International search[X]US6041877  (YAMADA TAKEMASA [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2005147312  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [A]JP2004114713  (JATCO LTD);
 [A]US6302227  (TAKEMURA TADASHI [JP], et al)
by applicantDE2943519