Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2593043

EP2593043 - SURGICAL SYSTEMS FOR IMPLANTING EXPANDABLE IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.07.2018  [2018/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NLT Spine Ltd.
P.O. Box 2289
Industrial Zone
Kfar Saba 44641 / IL
[2013/21]
Inventor(s)01 / SIEGAL, Tzony
Moshav Shoeva
90855 Shoeva / IL
02 / LOEBL, Oded
18 Hasigalit St.
40600 Tel Mond / IL
03 / TOUBIA, Didier
11 Hagdud Haivri St.
43559 Raanana / IL
 [2013/21]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/21]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date11751646.814.07.2011
WO2011IB53143
Priority number, dateUS20100364412P15.07.2010         Original published format: US 364412 P
[2013/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012007918
Date:19.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2593043
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012
[2013/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44, A61F2/46
[2013/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/21]
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE SYSTEME ZUR IMPLANTATION VON EXPANDIERBAREN IMPLANTATEN[2013/21]
English:SURGICAL SYSTEMS FOR IMPLANTING EXPANDABLE IMPLANTS[2013/21]
French:SYSTÈMES CHIRURGICAUX PERMETTANT D'IMPLANTER DES IMPLANTS EXPANSIBLE[2013/21]
Entry into regional phase12.02.2013National basic fee paid 
12.02.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/21]
03.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/27]
27.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201707   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2008084479  (NONLINEAR TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,7,11,12,14,21,23 * . * * page 2, lines 28,29 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 19 * * page 7, lines 17,18 * * page 8, line 6 * * page 9, lines 7-13,23,24 * * page 10, lines 2-5 * * page 12, lines 9-19 * * page 13, lines 24-26 * * page 15, lines 20,25 * * figure -; claims 1,7,11,16,17 * [Y] 2-6,8,17-20,22,25 [I] 24;
 [YA]US2008243255  (BUTLER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [Y] 2-6,8,17-20,25 * . * * paragraphs [0013] , [0027] , [0028] , [0031] , [0032] , [0039] - [0041]; figure -; claim 1 * [A] 1,11,14,21;
 [YA]US2008125865  (ABDELGANY MAHMOUD F [US]) [Y] 22 * . * * paragraph [0050]; figure 14 * [A] 21;
 [A]US2008312743  (VILA THIERRY [FR], et al) [A] 1,4-6,11,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006072941  (SIEGAL TZONY [IL]) [A] 1,7,11 * figure -; claims 1,11,15,16 *;
 [A]WO2010013188  (NONLINEAR TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,7,11,25 * figure -; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]WO2010008353  (HAYS SAGLIK URUNLERI IC VE DIS [TR], et al) [A] 1,18 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009157084  (AALSMA ARTHUR MARTINUS MICHAEL [NL], et al) [A] 2,11,14,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006241643  (LIM ROY [US], et al) [A] 25 * the whole document *