blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2606440

EP2606440 - PREDICTIVE QUERY COMPLETION AND PREDICTIVE SEARCH RESULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.05.2021
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2024Change - representative 
14.02.2024Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2013/26]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HANSSON, Othar
881 Markham Terrace
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
02 / BLACK, David
1050 Crestview Drive, Apt. 4
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
03 / WILEY, Jon M.
364 Paul Avenue
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
04 / TUNGARE, Manas
750 North Shoreline Boulevard, Apt. 117
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
05 / MAHKOVEC, Ziga
3600 21st Street, Apt. 504
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
06 / MCMAHAN, Benjamin J.
60 Descanso Drive, Apt. 3201
San Jose, California 95134 / US
07 / GOMES, Benedict A.
515 Lytton Ave
Palo Alto, California 94301 / US
08 / EFFRAT, Jonathan J.
327B Bush Street
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
09 / WRIGHT, Johanna R.
495 Toft Street
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
10 / WICHARY, Marcin K.
861 Post Street 17
San Francisco, California 94109 / US
11 / STROHMAN, Trevor
574 S. Taaffe Street
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
 [2015/26]
Former [2013/26]01 / HANSSON, Othar
881 Markham Terrace
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
02 / BLACK, David
63-07 Saunder Street
Rego Park, New York 11374 / US
03 / WILEY, Jon M.
364 Paul Avenue
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
04 / TUNGARE, Manas
750 North Shoreline Boulevard, Apt. 117
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
05 / MAHKOVEC, Ziga
3600 21st Street, Apt. 504
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
06 / MCMAHAN, Benjamin J.
60 Descanso Drive, Apt. 3201
San Jose, California 95134 / US
07 / GOMES, Benedict A.
79 Eldora Drive
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
08 / EFFRAT, Jonathan J.
327B Bush Street
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
09 / WRIGHT, Johanna R.
495 Toft Street
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
10 / WICHARY, Marcin K.
861 Post Street 17
San Francisco, California 94109 / US
11 / STROHMAN, Trevor
385 Waverly Street
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
Representative(s)Marks & Clerk GST
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/26]Schley, Jan Malte
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8
80807 München / DE
Application number, filing date11751746.619.08.2011
WO2011US48419
Priority number, dateUS20100375222P19.08.2010         Original published format: US 375222 P
[2013/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2012024585
Date:23.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2606440
Date:26.06.2013
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2013/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.02.2012
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/30
[2013/26]
CPC:
G06F16/3322 (EP,US); G06F16/338 (EP,US); G06F16/90324 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US); G06Q30/0275 (EP,US); G06F16/3338 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/26]
TitleGerman:AUSFÜRHUNG EINER PRÄDIKTIVEN ABFRAGE UND PRÄDIKTIVE SUCHERGEBNISSE[2013/26]
English:PREDICTIVE QUERY COMPLETION AND PREDICTIVE SEARCH RESULTS[2013/26]
French:RÉALISATION DE REQUÊTES PRÉDICTIVES ET RÉSULTATS DE RECHERCHES PRÉDICTIVES[2013/26]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2013National basic fee paid 
21.02.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/26]
27.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2017
13.06.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.04.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2023Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2023
15.03.2023Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.03.2023Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination30.05.2023Appeal received No.  T0247/24
30.05.2023Payment of appeal fee
26.07.2023Statement of grounds filed
25.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2388/17
25.07.2017Payment of appeal fee
20.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.11.2020Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
18.12.2020Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
27.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 11
29.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 12
28.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[I]US2008109401  (SAREEN GAURAV [US], et al) [I] 1-42 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026]; figures 3,4 ** paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [I]US2009094211  (MARVIT DAVID L [US], et al) [I] 1-42 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] *;
 [I]US2009119289  (GIBBS KEVIN A [US], et al) [I] 1-42 * figures 1,3,11 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0100] *
by applicantUS20110375222
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.