Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2465751

EP2465751 - SHOCK ABSORBING STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NSK Ltd.
6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8560 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]For all designated states
NSK Ltd.
6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8560 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AKUTSU, Naoto
c/o NSK Ltd.
1-8-1, Soja-machi
Maebashi-shi
Gunma 371-0583 / JP
02 / NAGASAWA, Makoto
c/o NSK Ltd.
1-8-1, Soja-machi
Maebashi-shi
Gunma 371-0583 / JP
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Cabinet Morelle & Bardou SC
Parc Technologique du Canal
9, avenue de l'Europe
BP 72253
31522 Ramonville Saint Agne Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/09]Hartmann, Jean-Luc , et al
Cabinet Morelle & Bardou SC
Parc Technologique du Canal
9, Avenue de l'Europe
B.P. 72253
31522 Ramonville Saint-Agne Cedex / FR
Former [2012/25]Morelle, Guy Georges Alain
Cabinet Morelle & Bardou, SC Parc Technologique du Canal 9, Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253
31522 Ramonville Saint Agne Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date11754270.425.07.2011
[2015/46]
WO2011JP66879
Priority number, dateJP2010018752524.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010187525
[2012/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012026257
Date:01.03.2012
Language:JA
[2012/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2465751
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2465751
Date:11.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B62D1/19, B60R21/09, B62D1/18, B62D5/04
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STOSSDÄMPFENDE LENKUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2012/25]
English:SHOCK ABSORBING STEERING DEVICE[2012/25]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION ABSORBANT LES CHOCS[2012/25]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2011Translation filed 
27.09.2011National basic fee paid 
27.09.2011Search fee paid 
27.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/25]
24.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2015Fee for grant paid
30.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2015
Opposition(s)12.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.07.2011
AL11.11.2015
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
BG11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE25.07.2016
LU25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU25.07.2011
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
BG11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE25.07.2016
LU25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/31]HU25.07.2011
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE25.07.2016
LU25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/29]HU25.07.2011
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE25.07.2016
LU25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU25.07.2011
AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE25.07.2016
LU25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/41]AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE25.07.2016
LU25.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/22]AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT11.11.2015
BE11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
RS11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
Documents cited:Search   [] No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[A]JPS6418775
 [A]JPH08183463
 [A]JPS5886764U
 [A]JP2003118602
 [A]JP2000108709
by applicant JPH0924843
  JPH09272448
  JPH10167083
  JP2004074985