Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2611423

EP2611423 - DRY POWDER INHALATION DRUG PRODUCTS EXHIBITING MOISTURE CONTROL PROPERTIES AND METHODS OF ADMINISTERING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.05.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2014/15]
Former [2013/39]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2013/28]For all designated states
Glaxosmithkline Intellectual Property (No. 2) Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9SG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ASWANIA, Osama
GlaxoSmithKline
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
02 / JIANG, Zhong
GlaxoSmithKline
Park Road
Ware
Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB
03 / ROCHE, Trevor, Charles
GlaxoSmithKline
Park Road
Ware
Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB
04 / WHITAKER, Mark
GlaxoSmithKline
Park Road
Ware
Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB
 [2013/28]
Representative(s)Billson, Siân Catherine , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Florence, Julia Anne
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2013/28]Florence, Julia Anne
GlaxoSmithKline Services Unlimited 980 Great West Road
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date11755043.431.08.2011
WO2011EP65056
Priority number, dateUS20100378412P31.08.2010         Original published format: US 378412 P
[2013/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012028663
Date:08.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2611423
Date:10.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012
[2013/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2611423
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/14, A61K31/58, A61P11/06, A61K31/137, A61K31/133, A61K9/00, A61J3/00, A61M15/00, B65B31/00
[2018/17]
Former International [2013/28]A61K9/14, A61K31/58, A61P11/06, A61K31/137, A61K31/133
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INHALATIONSMEDIKAMENTE IN TROCKENPULVERFORM MIT FEUCHTIGKEITSREGELUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERABREICHUNG[2013/28]
English:DRY POWDER INHALATION DRUG PRODUCTS EXHIBITING MOISTURE CONTROL PROPERTIES AND METHODS OF ADMINISTERING THE SAME[2013/28]
French:PRODUITS MÉDICAMENTEUX POUR INHALATION SOUS FORME DE POUDRE SÈCHE PRÉSENTANT PROPRIÉTÉS DE RÉGULATION D'HUMIDITÉ ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'ADMINISTRATION[2013/28]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2013National basic fee paid 
27.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/28]
13.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.12.2014Fee for grant paid
10.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15172604.9  / EP2954888
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.03.2016  24.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Oser, Andreas
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  24.03.2016  31.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 03  24.03.2016  31.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva UK Limited
Ridings Point
Whistler Drive
Castleford WF10 5HX / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [2019/49]
Former [2018/51]
Opponent(s)01  23.03.2016  24.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Oser, Andreas
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 02  24.03.2016  31.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 03  24.03.2016  31.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva UK Limited
Ridings Point
Whistler Drive
Castleford WF10 5HX / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2017/39]
Opponent(s)01  23.03.2016  24.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Oser, Andreas
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 02  24.03.2016  31.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 03  24.03.2016  31.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva UK Limited
Ridings Point
Whistler Drive
Castleford WF10 5HX / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
Former [2016/18]
Opponent(s)01  23.03.2016   
Oser, Andreas
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 02  24.03.2016  31.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Hally, Anna-Louise
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
 03  24.03.2016  31.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva UK Limited
Ridings Point
Whistler Drive
Castleford WF10 5HX / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
Former [2016/17]
Opponent(s)01  23.03.2016   
Oser, Andreas
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 02  24.03.2016   
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Hally, Anna-Louise
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
30.05.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
17.05.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.05.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition26.07.2018Appeal received No.  T1818/18
27.09.2018Statement of grounds filed
13.07.2018Appeal received No.  T1818/18
27.09.2018Statement of grounds filed
27.07.2018Appeal received No.  T1818/18
26.09.2018Statement of grounds filed
06.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2011
AL24.06.2015
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
CH31.08.2015
IE31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU31.08.2011
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
CH31.08.2015
IE31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2017/39]HU31.08.2011
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
CH31.08.2015
IE31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2017/22]AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
CH31.08.2015
IE31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
CH31.08.2015
IE31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/36]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
CH31.08.2015
IE31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/33]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
CH31.08.2015
IE31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/22]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/18]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/17]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
LU31.08.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO03024439  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-22 * page 13, line 17 - line 18 * * page 16, line 6 - line 32 * * page 25, line 22 - page 26, line 10 *;
 [AD]WO0198174  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-22 * page 1, lines 1-14 * * page 6, line 20 - line 25 * * page 2, line 1 - line 3 * * page 16, line 13 - page 17, line 29 * * page 21, line 21 * * page 22, line 25 * * claims 1,20,24-25 * * figures 5,9,10 *;
 [A]US7101866  (BIGGADIKE KEITH [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 1-10 *;
 [YP]WO2010097115  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [YP] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [YP]WO2011067212  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [YP] 1-22 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2008040841
 US2008063719
 US7361787
 US7439393
 US7101866
 GB2242134
 US6032666
 US5860419
 US5873360
 US5590645
 US6378519
 US6536427
 GB2178965
 GB2129691
 GB2169265
 US4778054
 US4811731
 US5035237
 EP0069715
 US6321747
 GB2064336
 WO03061743
 WO2007012871
 WO2007068896
 WO0198174
 US5187921
 US2005183395
 US2008308102
    - PHARM. RES, (1988), vol. 5, pages 506 - 508
 US20090613784
 US20120613784
OppositionWO03024439
 WO0198174
 WO2008040841
 WO2008135570
 US5829434
 WO2010097115
 WO2005044186
 WO2009013244
 WO2007109606
 EP2954888
    - "View on NCT01128569 on 2010_05_21; Randomised Study Comparing the Effects of Inhaled FF/GW642444M Combination and FF on an Allergen Induced Asthmatic Response", (20100521), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/archive/NCT01128569/2010_05_21, XP055307310
    - "Multisorb Introduces Desiccant Integration Approaches to Preserve the Function of Respiratory Drug Devices and their Drug Product Formulations - New Generation of Multiform Coated Solid Form™ Sorbents Provide Enhanced Protection for Reservoir Dry Powder Inhalation Devices", (20070700), URL: http://www.multisorb.com/news-and-events/news/multisorb-introduces-desiccant-integration-approaches-to-preserve-the-function-of-respiratory-drug-devices-and-their-drug-product-formulations-new-generation-of-multiform-coated-solid-form-sorbents-provide-enhanced-protection-for-reservoir-dry-powder-inh, XP055307313
    - RAJKUMARI N. JASHNANI et al., "Testing of dry powder aerosol formulations in different environmental conditions", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (19950102), vol. 113, no. Issue 1, pages 123 - 130, XP055307321
    - RAJKUMARI N . JASHNANI et al., "Dry powder aerosol generation in different environments: Performance comparisons of albuterol, albuterol sulfate, albuterol adipate and albuterol stearate", International Journal of Pharmaceutics;, (19960315), vol. 130, no. Issue 1, pages 13 - 24, XP002044696

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(95)04211-3
    - VESA-PEKKA LEHTO et al., "Moisture transfer into medicament chambers equipped with a double-barrier-desiccant system", International Journal of Pharmaceutics;, (20040504), vol. 275, no. Issues 1-2, pages 155 - 164, XP055307324
    - MASAKO TO et al., "Fluticasone Furoate, A Novel Enhanced-affinity Inhaled Corticosteroid (ICS), Has More Potent Anti-inflammatory Effects Than Fluticasone Propionate In Peripheral Blood Mononuclear Cells From Asthma And COPD Patients", Am J Respir Crit Care Med, vol. 181, (20100500), URL: http://www.atsjournals.org/doi/abs/10.1164/ajrccm-conference.2010.181.1_MeetingAbstracts.A4454, XP055307329

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/ajrccm-conference.2010.181.1_MeetingAbstracts.A4454
    - STERLING et al., "Dose-Related Efficacy And Optimal Once-daily (d) Dosing Interval Of The Long-Acting Beta2 Agonist (laba), Vilanterol Trifenatate (vi), In Adults With Persistent Asthma", American Thoracic Society International Conference Abstracts: C39 novel therapeutic options in airways disease, (20110517), XP055307364

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/ajrccm-conference.2011.183.1_MeetingAbstracts.A4488
    - CAZZOLA et al., "beta2-adrenoceptor agonists: current and future direction", British Journal of Pharmacology, (20110000), vol. 163, pages 4 - 17, XP055307334
    - BUSSE et al., "Fluticasone Furoate (FF), A Once-Daily Inhaled Corticosteroid (ICS), Is Efficacious In Patients With Uncontrolled Asthma Across A Range Of Treatment Steps", American Thoracic Society International Conference Abstracts: A31 Optimizing therapeutic strategies in airways disease,, (20110515), XP055307356

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/ajrccm-conference.2011.183.1_MeetingAbstracts.A1298
    - BLEECKER et al., "Consistently Favourable Safety Profile Of Fluticasone Furoate (FF), A Once-Daily (od) Inhaled Corticosteroid (ICS), Across A Range Of Treatment Steps In Patients With Uncontrolled Asthma", American Thoracic Society International Conference Abstracts: A31 Optimizing therapeutic strategies in airways disease,, (20110515), XP055307361
    - David Vaczek, "Dialing in stable packaging for sensitive drugs", Pharmaceutical & Medical Packaging News, (20100701), URL: http://www.packagingdigest.com/desiccants/pmp-Dialing%20in%20stable%20packaging%20for%20sensitive%20drugs-100701, XP055307343
    - COMMITTEE FOR MEDICINAL PRODUCTS FOR HUMAN USE (CHMP), "Guideline on the pharmaceutical quality of inhalation and nasal products", (20060621), pages 1 - 27, URL: http://www.ema.europa.eu/docs/en_GB/document_library/Scientific_guideline/2009/09/WC500003568.pdf, XP055135488
    - "Metered dose inhaler (MDI) and dry powder inhaler (DPI) drug products, chemistry, manufacturing, and cold pulse documentation, graft guidance", Draft- Guidance for industry, (19981000), pages 1 - 64, XP003023189
    - M. TELKO et al., "Dry Powder Inhaler Formulation", Respiratory Care, (20050900), vol. 50, no. 9, pages 1209 - 1227, XP055227810
    - LEHTO et al., "Moisture transfer into medicament chambers equipped with the double-barrier-desiccant system", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (20040000), vol. 275, pages 155 - 164, XP055307324
    - "Drying", M.E. AULTON, Pharmaceutics: The Science of Dosage Form Design, Second Edition, Elsevier ltd., (20020000), pages 379 - 382, XP055306320
    - Institute of Measurement and Control, "A Guide to the Measurement of Humidity", (19960000), pages 1 - 68, URL: http://www.rotronic.com/media/productattachments/files/n/p/npl_guide_to_humidity.pdf, XP055306323
    - S. BELL, "A beginner's guide to humidity measurement", (20111000), ISSN 1368-6550, pages 1 - 23, XP055306330
    - Rotronic AG, "HygroPalm HP23-A/ HP23-AW-A Hand-Held Indicator", User Guide, (20120106), pages 1 - 39, XP055306336
    - GlaxoSmithKline, "GlaxoSmithKline commences Relovair Phase III asthma programme", Press Release, (20100319), XP055306359
    - GlaxoSmithKline, "Randomised Study Comparing the Effects of Inhaled Fluticasone Furoate (FF)/Vilanterol (VI; GW642444M) Combination and FF on an Allergen Induced Asthmatic Response", (20100520), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/results/NCT01128569?term=GW+642444M+fluticasone&rank=4, XP055306360
    - A. FORD et al., "The therapeutic index of vilanterol trifenatate (VI)", Eur. Resp. J., (20100000), vol. 36, no. suppl. 54, page 1184, XP055307524
    - N. HANANIA et al., "Safety of vilanterol Trifenatate (VI) in a COPD dose-ranging study", Eur. Resp. J., (20100000), vol. 36, no. suppl. 54, page 1185, XP055307526
    - "Particulate Interactions in Dry Powder Aerosols", X.-M. ZENG et al., Particle Interactions in Dry Powder Formulations for Inhalation, Taylor & Francis Inc., (20010000), pages 2pp, 133 - 173, XP055306381