Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2499543

EP2499543 - A PREDICTIVE CONTROL AND VIRTUAL DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR A NUMERICALLY CONTROLLED MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.05.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FIDIA S.p.A.
Corso Lombardia, 11, Zona Industriale Pescarito
10099 San Mauro Torinese (Torino) / IT
[2012/38]
Inventor(s)01 / MORFINO, Giuseppe
Via San Felice 98
I-10025 PINO TORINESE (Torino) / IT
02 / FRANCESE, Carla
Via delle Primule 59 bis
I-10151 Torino / IT
03 / VESCO, Mario
Via Superga 38/D
I-10020 BALDISSERO TORINESE (Torino) / IT
04 / GHEZZO, Edoardo
Via Massena 82
I-10128 Torino / IT
 [2012/38]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/38]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11755136.605.08.2011
WO2011IB53512
Priority number, dateIT2010TO0068306.08.2010         Original published format: IT TO20100683
[2012/38]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012017419
Date:09.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2499543
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012
[2012/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/4069
[2012/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/38]
TitleGerman:PRÄDIKTIVE STEUERUNG UND VIRTUELLES ANZEIGESYSTEM FÜR EIN NUMERISCH GESTEUERTES MASCHINENWERKZEUG[2012/38]
English:A PREDICTIVE CONTROL AND VIRTUAL DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR A NUMERICALLY CONTROLLED MACHINE TOOL[2012/38]
French:SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE VIRTUEL ET DE COMMANDE PRÉDICTIVE POUR MACHINE-OUTIL COMMANDÉE NUMÉRIQUEMENT[2012/38]
Entry into regional phase14.06.2012National basic fee paid 
14.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/38]
03.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.10.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination02.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0601/16
04.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[IY]US2005102054  (DOLANSKY STEFAN [DE]) [I] 1,3-10 * page 1 - page 4 * * figures 1, 2A * [Y] 2;
 [IY]WO2009158559  (SIEMENS PRODUCT LIFECYCLE MAN SOFTWARE INC [US], et al) [I] 1,3-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0077] * [Y] 2;
 [YDA]US6546127  (SEONG DAE JUNG [KR], et al) [YD] 2 * column 1 - column 2 * [A] 1,3-10;
 [YDA]US2010063616  (MORI MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [YD] 2 * page 1 - page 2 * [A] 1,3-10;
 [A]US2002164221  (IZUTSU YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 6-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO03019454  (SURFWARE INC [US]) [A] 6-10 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6546127
 US2010063616