Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2499543


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.01.2020 Change: Date of oral proceedings
24.01.2020 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.03.2016 Deletion: Appeal number
07.03.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
07.12.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
07.12.2015 New entry: Appeal number
26.10.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.10.2015 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
31.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
30.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.01.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.01.2014 First examination report
11.10.2013 Change - extension states published on  13.11.2013  [2013/46]
30.08.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.01.2013 Amendment by applicant
17.08.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.09.2012  [2012/38]
17.08.2012 Request for examination filed published on  19.09.2012  [2012/38]
17.07.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
22.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
10.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
22.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication