Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2499543 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180008385 CN201610244495 EP11755136



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9317029Global Dossier 19.04.2016B2
US2012290122 15.11.2012A1
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
WO2011IB53512 05.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5816632BGlobal Dossier 18.11.2015B2
JP2013515313 02.05.2013A
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
WO2011IB53512 05.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105867306Global Dossier 17.08.2016A
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
CN201180008385 05.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102754039Global Dossier 24.10.2012A
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
WO2011IB53512 05.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2784720Global Dossier 19.09.2017C
CA2784720 09.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
WO2011IB53512 05.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2499543Global Dossier 19.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
WO2011IB53512 05.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012015932 26.12.2017A2
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
WO2011IB53512 05.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2543949 10.03.2015C2
RU2012125163 27.12.2013A
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
WO2011IB53512 05.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012017419Global Dossier 09.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202011110733U 14.12.2015U1
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IT1401373 18.07.2013B1
ITTO20100683 07.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
ITTO20100683 06.08.2010