Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2618889

EP2618889 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING RADIALLY-ALIGNED SEGMENTED ELECTRODES FOR LEADS OF ELECTRICAL STIMULATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.05.2015
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation
25155 Rye Canyon Loop
Valencia, CA 91355 / US
[2013/31]
Inventor(s)01 / PIANCA, Anne, Margaret
122 Montana Avenue
Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US
02 / SUNDARAMURTHY, Priya
38591 Wilde Terrace
Frémont CA 94536 / US
 [2013/31]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date11755532.606.09.2011
WO2011US50530
Priority number, dateUS20100385080P21.09.2010         Original published format: US 385080 P
[2013/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012039919
Date:29.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2618889
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012
[2013/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2618889
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05, A61N1/36, // A61N1/04
[2014/04]
Former International [2013/31]A61N1/08, A61N1/05, H01R43/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON RADIAL AUSGERICHTETEN SEGMENTIERTEN ELEKTRODEN FÜR ELEKTRODEN ELEKTRISCHER STIMULATIONSSYSTEME[2013/31]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING RADIALLY-ALIGNED SEGMENTED ELECTRODES FOR LEADS OF ELECTRICAL STIMULATION SYSTEMS[2013/31]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER ET D'UTILISER DES ÉLECTRODES SEGMENTÉES ALIGNÉES DE FAÇON RADIALE POUR DES FILS DE SYSTÈMES D'ÉLECTROSTIMULATION[2013/31]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2013National basic fee paid 
04.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
25.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2014Fee for grant paid
05.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2014
Opposition(s)24.04.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.09.2011
AL23.07.2014
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
IE06.09.2014
LU06.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU06.09.2011
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
IE06.09.2014
LU06.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2017/46]HU06.09.2011
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
IE06.09.2014
LU06.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU06.09.2011
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
IE06.09.2014
LU06.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2016/28]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
IE06.09.2014
LU06.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2016/22]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
IE06.09.2014
LU06.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/51]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
IE06.09.2014
LU06.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/37]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
IE06.09.2014
LU06.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
LU06.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
LU06.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
LU06.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
LU06.09.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/20]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT23.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]US2008114230  (ADDIS BRUCE [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0045] *;
 [A]US5000194  (VAN DEN HONERT CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1, 2 * * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 62 *;
 [A]WO2009102536  (INTELECT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7809446
 US2007150036
 US2009276021
 US2009187222
 US20080237888
 US20090170037
 US20080022953
 US20100316759