Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751991

EP2751991 - USER INTERFACE CONTROL IN A MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/24]
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Hartung, Frank
Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
02 / Hamm, Laurits
Veltmanplatz 20
52062 Aachen / DE
03 / Kampmann, Markus
Bremenberg 36a
52072 Aachen / DE
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2019/24]
Former [2014/28]Schwarz, Markku
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date11757351.919.09.2011
[2019/24]
WO2011EP66237
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013041121
Date:28.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751991
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2751991
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/15, G06F3/0481
[2019/12]
Former International [2014/28]H04N7/14, H04N7/15
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENSTEUERUNG FÜR MULTIMEDIA-KONFERENZSYSTEM[2019/13]
English:USER INTERFACE CONTROL IN A MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCE SYSTEM[2014/28]
French:CONTROLE D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DANS UN SYSTEME DE CONFERENCE MULTIMEDIA[2019/12]
Former [2014/28]BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENSTEUERUNG IN EINEM MULTIMEDIA-KONFERENZSYSTEM
Former [2014/28]COMMANDE D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CONFÉRENCE MULTIMÉDIA
Entry into regional phase28.03.2014National basic fee paid 
28.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
17.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2019Fee for grant paid
02.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2011112640  (VUMANITY MEDIA LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 9-13 * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0132] *;
 [X]US6744460  (NIMRI ALAIN [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 1a-1b * * figures 5-6 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] *;
 [X]WO2009137260  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * figures 1-3B * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059] *;
 [X]US2011093273  (LEE BOWON [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1A-1B * * figures 3C-3D *;
 [A]WO2008027724  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] *;
 [A]US2002093531  (BARILE JOHN [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 2-6 *;
 [A]US2009009587  (LINDBERGH DAVID JORDAN [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]JPH07336660  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract *