blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2751991 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2751991



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 250
25.06.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
02.05.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
02.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.03.2019 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
15.03.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.03.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
26.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
07.02.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.11.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
12.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 5
17.10.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 5
25.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
23.06.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.03.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.03.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
28.03.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
28.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
28.03.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.03.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
04.03.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.03.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.03.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.03.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.02.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
07.02.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
07.02.2014 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
31.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.01.2014 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.01.2014 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
07.01.2014 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.09.2013 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.09.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
20.08.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
08.08.2013 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.07.2013 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.07.2013 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
29.07.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.07.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
28.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
17.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
19.09.2011 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
19.09.2011 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
19.09.2011 Description PCT receiving Office 15
19.09.2011 Drawings PCT receiving Office 7